Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Le, Binh, filed a(n) Other (Civil) case represented by Mills, Michael A, Kassab, David Eric, Kassab, Lance C, Pierce, Nicholas R, against Maccthern, Pllc, Mccathern, Levi, Ii, Muckleroy, Matthew, Sherry, James, represented by Cobb, William D, Jr, Cobb, William D, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 116th District Court with PARKER, TONYA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 18, 2021 |
CategoryOther (Civil) |
Last RefreshedApril 22, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House116th District Court |
This case involves a legal malpractice and negligence lawsuit filed by the plaintiff, Larry Le, against his former attorneys, the defendants Eric Bosarge and the Bosarge Law Firm, LLC. Le claims that the defendants committed legal malpractice and wer...
CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: April 15, 2024EXHIBIT LIST
Date: April 15, 2024EXHIBITS
Date: April 15, 2024EXHIBIT LIST
Date: April 15, 2024ORDER - LEAVE
Date: April 15, 2024MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: April 15, 2024MOTION - JUDGMENT
Date: April 19, 2024OBJECTION
Date: April 15, 2024NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 15, 2024NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: December 18, 2023OBJECTION
Date: January 12, 2024CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 26, 2023Motion - Reconsider
Date: January 19, 2024Motion - Leave
Date: January 19, 2024RESPONSE
Date: October 30, 2023Motion - Exclude
Date: November 02, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 15, 2022MOTION - LEAVE
Date: December 15, 2023MOTION - RECONSIDER
Date: December 15, 2023RESPONSE
Date: January 18, 2024Motion - Exclude
Date: November 02, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 12, 2024NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 12, 2024NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: December 19, 2023DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: December 04, 2023ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: January 20, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 14, 2023RESPONSE
Date: October 30, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: November 15, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 06, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: November 06, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: November 06, 2023ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: August 04, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 20, 2023FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW
Date: July 31, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: July 24, 2023OBJECTION
Date: July 24, 2023Motion - Continuance
Date: January 20, 2023DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 17, 2023FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW
Date: July 31, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: August 02, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 28, 2023DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 17, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 02, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: July 17, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: July 17, 2023OBJECTION
Date: May 03, 2023OBJECTION
Date: July 24, 2023Motion - Strike
Date: January 05, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: July 17, 2023OBJECTION
Date: July 24, 2023OBJECTION
Date: May 02, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: July 17, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: April 25, 2023SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: April 28, 2023RESPONSE
Date: January 03, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 26, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT LIST
Date: January 18, 2023ORDER - STRIKE
Date: January 05, 2023RESPONSE
Date: January 04, 2023ORDER - MISC.
Date: January 06, 2023DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 18, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: January 18, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: January 13, 2023MOTION - LEAVE
Date: December 21, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 13, 2023ORDER - JUDGMENT
Date: January 06, 2023RESPONSE
Date: January 17, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: January 17, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 03, 2023ORDER - JUDGMENT
Date: January 06, 2023MOTION - LEAVE
Date: December 22, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 18, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 21, 2022Non Jury Trial
Date: April 15, 2024OBJECTION
Date: April 12, 2024OBJECTION
Date: April 12, 2024ORDER - MISC.
Date: January 29, 2024NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 24, 2024ORDER - MISC.
Date: November 13, 2023Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: December 15, 2022MOTION - EXCLUDE
Date: June 30, 2023RESPONSE
Date: December 12, 2022Motion - Strike
Date: December 07, 2022OBJECTION
Date: December 12, 2022ORDER - DENY
Date: December 09, 2022RESPONSE
Date: December 05, 2022Motion - Continuance
Date: December 02, 2022FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW
Date: April 12, 2024NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: December 02, 2022MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: January 24, 2024ORDER - DENY
Date: November 13, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: December 01, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 06, 2023RESPONSE
Date: November 09, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 15, 2022MOTION - STRIKE
Date: November 03, 2022MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: October 12, 2022RESPONSE
Date: December 14, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: November 09, 2022OBJECTION
Date: September 16, 2022MOTION - STRIKE
Date: November 03, 2022COUNTER CLAIM
Date: August 19, 2022JURY DEMAND
Date: October 28, 2022SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: November 30, 2021AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 19, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: September 23, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: December 02, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 25, 2021DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: September 28, 2021RESPONSE
Date: September 23, 2021MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: November 23, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 10, 2022CASE FILING COVER SHEET
Date: June 18, 2021ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: June 18, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: November 09, 2022OBJECTION
Date: November 07, 2022MOTION - STRIKE
Date: October 28, 2022MOTION - LEAVE
Date: September 02, 2022DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: June 24, 2022MOTION - DISMISS
Date: August 23, 2021REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: June 18, 2021EXHIBIT LIST
Date: April 10, 2024EXHIBIT LIST
Date: April 11, 2024RESPONSE
Date: January 16, 2024CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: July 07, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: December 07, 2022DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: December 07, 2022RESPONSE
Date: November 30, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 28, 2022RESPONSE
Date: November 07, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: November 03, 2022DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: October 21, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 02, 2022Scheduling Conference
Date: December 14, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 11, 2021MOTION - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: November 11, 2021AMENDED PETITION
Date: September 23, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: July 26, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: December 02, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: November 28, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: November 11, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 10, 2022Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: November 10, 2022RESPONSE
Date: November 03, 2022NO EVIDENCE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: October 28, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: October 14, 2022ORDER - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: November 18, 2021Motion - Dismiss
Date: September 30, 2021MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: September 27, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: June 24, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: June 24, 2021Motion - Leave
Date: January 19, 2024Motion - Reconsider
Date: January 19, 2024Non Jury Trial
Date: January 29, 2024Non Jury Trial
Date: August 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Evidentiary Hearing CLOSING ARGUMENTS (VIA ZOOM) |
|
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS DEFENDANTS SUMMATION PRESENTATION RECEIVED |
|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT MOTION - JUDGMENT |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
E-SERVED COPY OF ORDER ORDER - LEAVE |
|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
LETTER FILING PROPOSED ORDER LEAVE CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE LETTER FILING PROPOSED ORDER FOR LEAVE |
|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFFS REVISED 3RD AMENDED TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST EXHIBIT LIST PLAINTIFFS REVISED 3RD AMENDED TRIAL |
|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
PARTIES STIPULATED EXHIBITS EXHIBITS PARTIES STIPULATED |
|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S 3RD AMENDED TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST EXHIBIT LIST PLAINTIFF'S 3RD AMENDED TRIAL |
|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
ORDER - LEAVE TO DESIGNATE STEVEN MITBY AS RETAINED EXPERT |
|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANTS' PROPOSED FINDING OF FACT AND CONCLUSION OF LAW MISCELLANOUS EVENT DEFENDANTS' PROPOSED FOF CONCLUSION OF LAW |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.