Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Griffin, Ruby, White, Gloria, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Hancock, Joshua, against Perez, Eloy, represented by Breeze, Johnny W, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 162nd District Court with WYSOCKI, ASHLEY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWYSOCKI, ASHLEY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 27, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House162nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 24, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: February 04, 2022OBJECTION
Date: July 22, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: July 22, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 05, 2022MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: March 07, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 19, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 16, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 29, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 29, 2022CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: August 23, 2021DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: March 21, 2022MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: August 09, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: March 29, 2022AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: July 22, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: February 04, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: March 07, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 09, 2022MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: February 07, 2022ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: August 10, 2022REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: May 27, 2021ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: May 27, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 21, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: February 28, 2023DISCOVERY
Date: December 14, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: July 01, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 30, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 05, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 09, 2021MOTION - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: July 01, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: July 01, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 01, 2021ORDER - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: July 06, 2021JURY DEMAND
Date: July 21, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 29, 2021SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: August 20, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: July 22, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 23, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: February 23, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: February 23, 2023MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: February 23, 2023PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: February 23, 2023MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: March 03, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: March 03, 2023PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: March 03, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: April 04, 2023MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: March 03, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: March 03, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: March 03, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 03, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: March 06, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: March 06, 2023NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: March 03, 2023NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: March 30, 2023DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: September 15, 2023CHARGE OF COURT
Date: June 26, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: June 26, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: June 26, 2023STRIKE SHEET
Date: June 26, 2023STRIKE SHEET
Date: June 26, 2023NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: September 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
FP NOTICE OF ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION |
|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
162nd Not of Int to Dismiss DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION |
|
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | CHARGE OF COURT | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEF/FIRST AMENDED EXHIBIT LIST EXHIBIT LIST DEF/1ST AMENDED |
|
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
162nd Jury Trial Reset Letter Jury Trial - Civil 2 DAYS |
|
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
STRIKE SHEET - DEF STRIKE SHEET DEF |
|
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
STRIKE SHEET - PLTF STRIKE SHEET PLTF |
|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL HEARING | |
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event | VACATION LETTER | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
162nd Jury Trial Reset Letter Jury Trial - Civil |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.