Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ordonez, Dora Luz, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Forman, Tanner C., against Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Jenkins, Young C., in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 44th District Court with WYSOCKI, ASHLEY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWYSOCKI, ASHLEY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 07, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House44th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: May 07, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: June 04, 2021SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: July 02, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 01, 2021ORDER - SETTING SCHEDULING CONF
Date: June 11, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 15, 2022JURY DEMAND
Date: May 07, 2021ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: May 11, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 26, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: May 07, 2021NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: July 05, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 14, 2022PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: April 15, 2022WITNESS LIST
Date: April 15, 2022EXHIBIT LIST
Date: April 15, 2022MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: April 15, 2022MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: May 12, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 12, 2022MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: May 12, 2022ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: May 17, 2022CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE
Date: May 13, 2022ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: May 19, 2022NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT
Date: June 24, 2022NOTICE OF NONSUIT
Date: July 21, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 21, 2022NOTE - CLERKS
Date: July 25, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Jury Trial - Civil | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | TRIAL SETTING (JURY) | |
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
MAILED COPY ORDER TO YOUNG C JENKINS NOTE - CLERKS COPY ORDER TO PARTIES |
|
July 22, 2022 | Docket Event | REACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NONSUIT | |
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER NONSUIT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT NONSUIT |
|
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event | INACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | |
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TRIAL JURY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.