Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Williby, Regina, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Freden, Michael C, against Garcia, Alberto, Ramirez, Jose Roberto, represented by Jenkins, Young C., Jones, Dianne K, Kimble, Robert Chad, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 116th District Court with PARKER, TONYA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 22, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House116th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: April 22, 2021SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: July 12, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 03, 2022ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: May 28, 2021MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: October 06, 2022SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: October 25, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 20, 2022MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: October 20, 2022Motion - Default Judgment
Date: March 02, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 20, 2023ORDER - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: February 24, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: April 03, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 10, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 28, 2021MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: May 18, 2022PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: May 02, 2022ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: February 08, 2022ISSUE CITATION
Date: April 22, 2021MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: May 02, 2022JURY DEMAND
Date: May 28, 2021WITNESS LIST
Date: May 02, 2022DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: November 04, 2022EXHIBIT LIST
Date: May 02, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 18, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 02, 2022SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: May 24, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 18, 2022MOTION - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: February 20, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 20, 2022Motion - Default Judgment
Date: March 02, 2023NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED
Date: March 10, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: March 10, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 17, 2023NOTE - CLERKS
Date: June 22, 2023MOTION - DISMISS
Date: June 13, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 13, 2023CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS
Date: March 03, 2023ORDER - JUDGMENT
Date: March 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 03, 2023SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: March 16, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 10, 2023RELEASE OF JUDGMENT
Date: June 09, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 10, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 20, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: September 11, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
116th Jury Trial Notice Jury Trial - Civil |
|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION - ALBERTO GARCIA CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION ALERBERTO GARCIA |
|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION - REGINA WILLIBY CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION REGINA WILLIBY |
|
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
MAILED TO ROBERT KIMBLE NOTE - CLERKS COPY OF DISMISSAL ORDER MAILED TO PLTF AND DEF |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DISMISSAL MOTION - DISMISS |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
RELEASE OF JUDGMENT AGAINST JOSE ROBERTO RAMIREZ RELEASE OF JUDGMENT AGAINST JOSE ROBERTO RAMIREZ |
|
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
116th Jury Trial Notice Jury Trial - Civil |
|
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULING ORDER AGREED |
|
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
FP NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT RULE 239(a) NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.