Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Martinez, Alfredo, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Almasri, Sam, Mandavia, Hazim, against Farmer, Joshua, represented by Alvarado, Daniel, Greener, Scott D., Knauff, Jerry Joe, Miller, J. Robert, Jr, Miller, Michael A, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 134th District Court with TILLERY, DALE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTILLERY, DALE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 05, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House134th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 15, 2021JURY DEMAND
Date: April 05, 2021NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: May 25, 2021ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: April 05, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: April 05, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 19, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: April 19, 2021NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: April 12, 2021SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: May 25, 2021DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: June 18, 2021MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: December 20, 2022WITNESS LIST
Date: December 20, 2022EXHIBIT LIST
Date: December 20, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: December 19, 2022NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: May 23, 2022PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: December 20, 2022DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 29, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 03, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: May 17, 2022PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: December 22, 2022NO EVIDENCE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: November 08, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: March 27, 2023MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: December 22, 2022MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: January 03, 2023MOTION - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: May 25, 2022WITNESS LIST
Date: December 22, 2022Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: December 22, 2022NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: February 21, 2023NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: January 06, 2023RULE 166
Date: December 29, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: December 29, 2022ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: January 03, 2023NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: October 25, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 17, 2022ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: April 20, 2021ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: October 20, 2021ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: May 22, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 20, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 25, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 08, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: November 30, 2022MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: October 04, 2021AMENDED PETITION
Date: December 16, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: March 29, 2023PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: March 27, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: March 27, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: March 28, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: March 29, 2023MOTION - DISMISS
Date: May 10, 2023FINAL DISPOSITION HEARING
Date: March 29, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 10, 2023Final Disposition Hearing
Date: May 19, 2023NOTE - CLERKS
Date: May 23, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Cover Sheet (General) NOTE - CLERKS ORDER DISMISS TO PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT |
|
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
134th Disposition Fridays Setting Final Disposition Hearing |
|
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DISMISSAL MOTION - DISMISS AGREED |
|
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER FOR DISMISSAL NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED AGREED ORDER FOR DISMISSAL |
|
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TRIAL Jury Trial - Civil Both ready 1-2 days, 2-4 wits |
|
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TRIAL Jury Trial - Civil Both ready 1-2 days, 2 wits (case tried & concluded) |
|
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
DC-21-04276 NFDH FINAL DISPOSITION HEARING NOTICE |
|
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event | JURY SWORN PANEL (OCA) | |
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
VOIR DIRE SETTLED PRIOR TO CHARGE BEING READ |
|
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT'S 2ND AMENDED EXHIBIT LIST EXHIBIT LIST DEFENDANT'S 2ND AMENDED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.