Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Williams, Marilyn, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Franklin, Jason F, Greco, Shelly, Jobin, Lauren V, Said, Rabia, against Guijoza, Eutiquio, Jru Properties, Llc, Rodriguez, Eleazar, Romo, Pablo, Iii, Unell, Joe, (total of 5) See All represented by Lecrone, Adam B, Teague, Mark, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 116th District Court with PARKER, TONYA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePARKER, TONYA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 17, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedJanuary 20, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House116th District Court |
This is an original petition for negligence filed on behalf of Marilyn Williams against Pablo Romo III, JRU Properties, LLC, Eutiquio Guijoza, and Eleazar Rodriguez. Williams was operating her vehicle northbound on IH-35 East and was stopped for traf...
MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: January 05, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 19, 2022MOTION - COMPEL
Date: October 04, 2021ORDER - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: February 14, 2022ISSUE CITATION
Date: March 17, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: April 07, 2022EXHIBIT LIST
Date: January 05, 2023PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: January 05, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 26, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: January 22, 2024AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 20, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: June 22, 2022SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: July 26, 2021WITNESS LIST
Date: January 05, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: May 04, 2023AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 26, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 12, 2021WITNESS LIST
Date: January 06, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: April 12, 2021ORDER - NONSUIT
Date: December 28, 2021MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: January 06, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 20, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 04, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: February 07, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 23, 2022DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: August 26, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: April 13, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: October 11, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 11, 2022CHARGE OF COURT
Date: January 06, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: April 02, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: December 20, 2021ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: July 13, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: November 29, 2021MOTION - BIFURCATE
Date: July 05, 2022Motion - Compel
Date: December 01, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 26, 2021MOTION - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: March 23, 2022ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: April 12, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 10, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 22, 2022CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: June 09, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 04, 2023AMENDED PETITION
Date: November 16, 2021MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: July 11, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: March 30, 2022MOTION - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: February 10, 2022AMENDED PETITION
Date: December 20, 2021RESPONSE
Date: November 29, 2021PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: May 15, 2023AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: April 07, 2023ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: March 17, 2021MOTION - LEAVE
Date: November 02, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 04, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 05, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 20, 2021Scheduling Conference
Date: July 27, 2021NOTICE OF NONSUIT
Date: December 20, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 08, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 05, 2023ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: April 26, 2021VACATION LETTER
Date: February 07, 2022ORDER - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: March 29, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: July 05, 2022Motion - Compel
Date: December 01, 2021Jury Trial - Civil
Date: May 08, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: May 08, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: August 28, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
JURY TRIAL NOTICE - DO NOT USE Jury Trial - Civil (Level 3) 2 TO 3 DAYS (COURT NOTEBOOK) |
|
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event | VACATION LETTER | |
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Notice Jury Trial - Civil (Level 3) 2 TO 3 DAYS (COURT NOTEBOOK) |
|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | VACATION LETTER | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANTS 1ST AMENDED PROPOSED JURY CHARGE PROPOSED JURY CHARGE DEFENDANTS 1ST AMENDED |
|
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial - Civil CARRIED FROM 5-8-2023 2 TO 3 DAYS (COURT NOTEBOOK) |
|
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Notice Jury Trial - Civil (Level 3) 2 TO 3 DAYS |
|
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Notice Jury Trial - Civil (Level 3) 2 TO 3 DAYS (COURT NOTEBOOK) |
|
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
LETTER REGARDING TRIAL CONFLICT CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE |
|
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION - JOE UNELL CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION JOE UNELL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.