Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Watson, Shante, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Odetunde, Adewale, against Brown, Joshua, Town East Heating & Air Condition Co, Llc, represented by Kennedy, David Mayo, Liser, Sandra Cockran, Saunders, James B, Zeller, Megan, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 134th District Court with TILLERY, DALE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTILLERY, DALE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 12, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House134th District Court |
This is an original petition filed by Shante Watson against Joshua Brown and Town East Heating & Air Conditioning Co., LLC. The plaintiff is alleging negligence and gross negligence against Joshua Brown and negligence against Town East Heating & Air...
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: March 12, 2021NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: March 17, 2021DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: May 14, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 01, 2021MOTION - TRANSFER - CHANGE OF VENUE
Date: April 09, 2021Motion - Transfer
Date: August 02, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: April 21, 2021MOTION - TRANSFER - CHANGE OF VENUE
Date: April 21, 2021RESPONSE
Date: July 23, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: April 09, 2021SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: April 18, 2021Jury Trial - Civil
Date: April 18, 2022RULE 11
Date: August 19, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 28, 2022MOTION - LEAVE
Date: February 28, 2022Motion - Compel
Date: March 31, 2022NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: March 30, 2022MOTION - LEAVE
Date: October 18, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 18, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 18, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: April 14, 2021NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: April 19, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: April 14, 2021CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE
Date: May 12, 2021CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: May 10, 2021DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: May 04, 2021JURY DEMAND
Date: March 16, 2021RESPONSE
Date: July 01, 2021Jury Trial - Civil
Date: February 06, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 26, 2022CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: June 21, 2021MOTION - COMPEL
Date: March 07, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 19, 2021RULE 11
Date: January 18, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: March 16, 2022RESPONSE
Date: March 18, 2022RESPONSE
Date: March 07, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 28, 2022MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: March 25, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 25, 2022SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: March 30, 2022MOTION - QUASH
Date: March 08, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: March 08, 2022MOTION - PROTECT
Date: February 28, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 28, 2022MOTION - STRIKE
Date: October 18, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 05, 2022MOTION - COMPEL
Date: February 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 12, 2021MOTION - STRIKE
Date: February 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 02, 2021ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: December 15, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 11, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 07, 2023RESPONSE
Date: August 07, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 26, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 19, 2022OBJECTION
Date: November 28, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: March 30, 2023MOTION - COMPEL
Date: November 11, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: April 26, 2022MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: July 11, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 11, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 16, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: April 22, 2022Motion - Strike
Date: July 29, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 26, 2023NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: December 16, 2022MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: March 17, 2023AMENDED PETITION
Date: January 10, 2023MOTION - PROTECT
Date: October 09, 2023OBJECTION
Date: October 21, 2022CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: November 28, 2022MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: December 07, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 07, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 03, 2023RESPONSE
Date: July 26, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: July 25, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 12, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 25, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 03, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 21, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: June 30, 2022Motion - Continuance
Date: July 19, 2023Motion - Compel
Date: March 31, 2022ISSUE CITATION
Date: March 16, 2021MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: November 21, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: July 25, 2023MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: July 21, 2023Motion - Transfer
Date: August 02, 2021MOTION - STRIKE
Date: November 15, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: December 04, 2023Motion - Strike
Date: November 28, 2023DISCOVERY
Date: July 31, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 29, 2023PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: July 21, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 07, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: July 26, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: July 21, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 13, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 21, 2023AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 13, 2023DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 29, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: July 26, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: November 27, 2023NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: August 10, 2023MOTION - PROTECT
Date: November 03, 2023MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: July 25, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: July 24, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: July 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 06, 2023Motion - Strike
Date: July 29, 2022Motion - Continuance
Date: July 19, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: July 31, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
134th Trial Notice Letters Jury Trial - Civil |
|
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFS MTN TO LIMIT TESTIMONY MOTION - MISCELLANOUS TO LIMIT THE TESTIMONY OF PLTS HEALTHCARE PROVIDERS |
|
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION RICHARD S. LEVY, M.D. |
|
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION DEFENDANTS |
|
November 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFS MTN TO STRIKE Motion - Strike 15 MINS - D/M/STRIKE - LIZ 214 919 3555 |
|
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF ADDITIONAL COUNSEL |
|
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT ON MTN TO STRIKE - DEF TOWN EAST |
|
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER LIMITING EXPERT TESTIMONY OF JONATHAN J. HALFORD NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLTF MOTION TO LIMIT EXPERT TESTIMONY FROM JONATHAN J. HALFORD MOTION - MISCELLANOUS TO LIMIT EXPERT TESTIMONY FROM JONATHAN J. HALFORD |
|
November 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED ORDER TO STRIKE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.