Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hernandez, Selena, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Kohm, David S, against Midway Auto Supply Inc, Wolfe, Brian, represented by Breeze, Johnny W, Lecrone, Adam B, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 193rd District Court with WHITMORE, BRIDGETT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWHITMORE, BRIDGETT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2020 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House193rd District Court |
SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: November 02, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: October 27, 2020DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: November 05, 2020ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: September 02, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 12, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: September 02, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 10, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 10, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 10, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 10, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 10, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 10, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 17, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 25, 2021MOTION - LEAVE
Date: May 07, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 10, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 10, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 10, 2020PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: October 05, 2021WITNESS LIST
Date: October 05, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 05, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 08, 2022EXHIBIT LIST
Date: October 05, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 10, 2020MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: October 05, 2021PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: October 05, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 10, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 10, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 10, 2020DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: August 04, 2021WITNESS LIST
Date: September 28, 2021PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: September 28, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 10, 2020EXHIBIT LIST
Date: September 28, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 30, 2021DISCOVERY
Date: September 20, 2021OBJECTION
Date: September 20, 2021DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: June 14, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 07, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 05, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: September 06, 2022MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: June 05, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: June 05, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: June 05, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: June 06, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: November 21, 2023CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: November 11, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: December 31, 2020CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: December 10, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 17, 2021PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: June 05, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: October 12, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 17, 2021AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: September 20, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 19, 2021ORDER - LEAVE
Date: September 20, 2021MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: September 28, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
193rd Jury Trial Notice Whitmore Jury Trial - Civil |
|
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | VACATION LETTER | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
193rd Jury Trial Notice Whitmore Jury Trial - Civil |
|
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER (DF) 1ST AMENDED MTN IN LIMINE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED ORDER (DF) 1ST AMENDED MTN IN LIMINE |
|
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER (DF) 1ST AMENDED MTN IN LIMINE MOTION - IN LIMINE 1ST AMENDED |
|
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT 1ST AMENDED EXHIBIT LIST EXHIBIT LIST DEFENDANT 1ST AMENDED |
|
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT 1ST AMENDED WITNESS LIST WITNESS LIST DEFENDANT 1ST AMENDED |
|
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT 1ST AMENDED PROPOSED JURY CHARGE PROPOSED JURY CHARGE DEFENDANT 1ST AMENDED |
|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | VACATION LETTER | |
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
193rd Jury Trial Notice Whitmore Jury Trial - Civil |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.