Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Lindley, Jon, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Horn, Zach, against Haghighi, Mohammad, Silvicom, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 95th District Court with PURDY, MONICA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePURDY, MONICA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2020 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedJuly 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House95th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: September 01, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 05, 2021NOTE - CLERKS
Date: January 06, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL - COVER LETTER AND ORDER OF NONSUIT - MOHAMMAD HAGHIGHI |
|
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
dwop hearing notice DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION |
|
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
MAILED COPY OF ORDER OF NONSUIT - SILVICOM INC NOTE - CLERKS - MAILED COPIES/ORDER OF NONSUIT/ALL PARTIES |
|
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING NOTICE OF NONSUIT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT ORDER OF NONSUIT |
|
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NONSUIT | |
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
dwop hearing notice NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR Dismissal re-set. Notice e-mailed to counsel. |
|
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
dwop hearing notice DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
dwop hearing notice NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR Set for Dismissal: 12/17/2020. Notice e-mailed to counsel. |
|
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED CITATION: MOHAMMAD HAGHIGHI RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
September 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED CITATION: SILVICOM INC RETURN OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.