Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jefferson Capital Systems, Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Smith, Ashley B, against Gulley, Jessica, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 193rd District Court with WHITMORE, BRIDGETT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWHITMORE, BRIDGETT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 15, 2020 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House193rd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: September 18, 2020ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 15, 2020NOTICE OF NONSUIT
Date: October 12, 2020DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: September 18, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 06, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: July 15, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 12, 2020NOTE - CLERKS
Date: October 13, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: October 12, 2020DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: October 15, 2020ISSUE CITATION
Date: July 16, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
193RD Initial Dismissal Notice DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION |
|
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
MAILED ORDER OF NONSUIT TO ASHLEY B SMITH NOTE - CLERKS MAILED ORDER TO ALL PARTIES |
|
October 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
PLTF/NOTICE OF NONSUIT NOTICE OF NONSUIT |
|
October 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER OF NONSUIT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT ORDER OF NONSUIT |
|
October 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
FILING NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITH ORDER CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE |
|
September 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
193RD Initial Dismissal Notice DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION |
|
September 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
193RD Initial Dismissal Notice DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION 30 DAY EXTENSION - RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXCUTED CITATION JESSICA GULLEY RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
July 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
CITATION JESSICA GULLEY |
|
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
ISSUE CITATION-JESSICA GULLEY ISSUE CITATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.