Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Batie, George, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Parry, Clayton L, against Doe, John, Perez, Antonia, represented by Bryson, Rance M, Byrne, Richard J, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 193rd District Court with WHITMORE, BRIDGETT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWHITMORE, BRIDGETT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 15, 2020 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House193rd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a plaintiff's original petition filed by George Batie against defendants John Doe A/N/F of Rosendo Hernandez and Antonia Perez in the District Court of the 193rd Judicial District in Dallas County, Texas. The plaintiff seeks monetar...
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 15, 2020DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: September 18, 2020ISSUE CITATION
Date: September 09, 2020THIRD PARTY ACTION
Date: September 09, 2020AMENDED PETITION
Date: October 02, 2020AMENDED PETITION
Date: January 12, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 14, 2020ISSUE CITATION
Date: January 12, 2021CASE FILING COVER SHEET
Date: July 15, 2020DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: August 11, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: February 02, 2021MOTION - DISMISS
Date: July 23, 2021NOTE - CLERKS
Date: August 02, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 23, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: July 15, 2020JURY DEMAND
Date: August 10, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 21, 2020Jury Trial - Civil
Date: August 10, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 10, 2020SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: August 13, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 28, 2020SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: August 28, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Jury Trial - Civil |
|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL TO RANCE BRYSON NOTE - CLERKS AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL MAILED TO ALL PARTIES |
|
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
AGREED MOTION TO DISMISS MOTION - DISMISS AGREED |
|
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED AGREED ORDER TO DISMISS NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT AGREED ORDER TO DISMISS |
|
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED CITATION - ANTONIA PEREZ RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
CITATION ANTONIA PEREZ |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
SECOND AMENDED PETITION AMENDED PETITION |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
ISSUE CITATION - ANTONIA PEREZ (P'S 2ND AMEND PET) ISSUE CITATION PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED PETITION |
|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
PLTF/NOTICE OF FILING BUSINESS RECORD AND COST OF SERVICE AFFIDAVITS AFFIDAVIT PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING BUSINESS RECORD AND COST OF SERVICE AFFIDAVITS |
|
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
PLTF/1ST AMENDED PETITION AMENDED PETITION PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.