Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Sab Representative, Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Youn Ku, Michelle, against 1G Acquisitions, Llc, represented by Graves, George T, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 101st District Court with WILLIAMS, STACI presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 06, 2020 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House101st District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: July 07, 2020ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 06, 2020MOTION - ENTER ORDER
Date: September 03, 2020AMENDED PETITION
Date: September 04, 2020ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 06, 2020MOTION - PROTECT
Date: October 12, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: July 31, 2020REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: July 07, 2020CASE FILING COVER SHEET
Date: July 06, 2020ISSUE CITATION
Date: July 07, 2020SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: July 11, 2021JURY DEMAND
Date: February 24, 2021Motion - Continuance
Date: August 12, 2022SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: August 15, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 02, 2021MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: October 01, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 25, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 01, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 25, 2021MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: July 02, 2021SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: September 08, 2021RULE 11
Date: July 22, 2022SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: October 29, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 13, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 28, 2022SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: October 08, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: July 28, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: July 28, 2022ORDER - PROTECT
Date: December 22, 2022NOTICE OF NONSUIT
Date: January 26, 2023Non Jury Trial
Date: May 02, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
101st J/NJ Trial Notice 2021 Non Jury Trial |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF NONSUIT NOTICE OF NONSUIT |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER - PROTECT | |
November 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
CONSIDER ON SUBMISSION M/PROTECT * PATTI SARGENT 214 999 4169 |
|
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULING ORDER AMENDED LEVEL 3 |
|
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING RE: MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE BY SUBMISSION Motion - Continuance VIA SUBMISSION *MAE MADDARAN *214-651-5689 |
|
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
LETTER RE: REQUEST FOR AGREED SUBMISSION DOCKET HEARING CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE RE: REQUEST FOR AGREED SUBMISSION DOCKET HEARING |
|
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING RE: MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE BY SUBMISSION NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT RE: MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE BY SUBMISSION |
|
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION - CONTINUANCE JOINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.