Case Last Refreshed: 31 minutes ago
White, Roscoe F., Iii, White, Rosscoe F., Iii, filed a(n) Other (Civil) case represented by Lurich, Ryan K, against Edinger, Elaine, First United Bank & Trust Company, represented by Seckel, Jeffrey Robert, Taubenfeld, Marc W., Wynne, Michael C, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 298th District Court with TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 02, 2020 |
CategoryOther (Civil) |
Last RefreshedMay 05, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House298th District Court |
Roscoe F. White, III. has sued First United Bank & Trust Company and is seeking a temporary and permanent injunction to stop the bank from foreclosing on his homestead. White entered into a Commercial Promissory Note with the bank on June 24, 2005, t...
NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 10, 2021Non Jury Trial
Date: June 29, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: April 12, 2021ORDER - TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER
Date: July 17, 2020ISSUE TRO
Date: July 27, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 28, 2020MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: April 14, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 28, 2020ISSUE NOTICE
Date: July 27, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 28, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 28, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 27, 2021REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: July 27, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 10, 2021ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 02, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 16, 2020ISSUE NOTICE
Date: July 02, 2020ORDER - EXTEND TRO
Date: July 31, 2020ORDER - TEMPORARY INJUNCTION
Date: August 19, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 04, 2020Temporary Injunction
Date: August 05, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 03, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 03, 2020MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: May 17, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: May 05, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 17, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: May 25, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 14, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 16, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 06, 2020Temporary Injunction
Date: July 20, 2020ISSUE CITATION
Date: July 02, 2020ORDER - TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER
Date: July 06, 2020ISSUE TRO
Date: July 02, 2020ISSUE CITATION
Date: July 27, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 14, 2020RULE 11
Date: July 16, 2020MOTION - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: July 16, 2020MOTION - EXTEND
Date: July 16, 2020TRUST RECEIPT
Date: July 06, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 14, 2020MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: July 28, 2021MOTION HEARING
Date: September 03, 2021AMENDED PETITION
Date: August 27, 2021RESPONSE
Date: August 27, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 02, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 21, 2021MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: February 09, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 11, 2022Non Jury Trial
Date: November 02, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 15, 2022MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: October 21, 2021MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: February 09, 2022Non Jury Trial
Date: February 21, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: February 17, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: January 17, 2024Non Jury Trial
Date: August 09, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: January 17, 2024MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: March 06, 2024NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 07, 2024Non Jury Trial
Date: September 05, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: January 17, 2024NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: December 01, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: April 12, 2024MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: December 29, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: April 05, 2024NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: December 20, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 10, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: September 21, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 07, 2024NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: December 29, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 15, 2022Non Jury Trial
Date: May 21, 2024OBJECTION
Date: March 06, 2024Non Jury Trial
Date: March 29, 2022RESPONSE
Date: January 12, 2024RESPONSE
Date: January 12, 2024MOTION HEARING
Date: November 14, 2023RESPONSE
Date: January 12, 2024OBJECTION
Date: January 16, 2024CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 23, 2022ORIGINAL ANSWER TO CROSS CLAIM - COUNTER PETITION
Date: December 29, 2023MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: September 20, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: April 05, 2024AMENDED PETITION
Date: December 29, 2023NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS
Date: February 07, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: August 10, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: March 07, 2024MOTION - RETAIN
Date: June 14, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: February 22, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 22, 2022Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: March 15, 2024RESPONSE
Date: November 13, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: March 07, 2024COUNTER CLAIM
Date: December 07, 2023MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: December 20, 2023Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: January 19, 2024Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: January 19, 2024ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 02, 2020Temporary Injunction
Date: July 20, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
NON JURY TRIAL NOTICE - DO NOT USE Non Jury Trial |
|
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
TO JUDGE REGARDING REGARDING SIGNING PROPOSED ORDERS CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE TO JUDGE REGARDING SIGNING PROPOSED ORDERS |
|
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE TO JUDGE REGARDING EARLY HEARING DATES |
|
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF MICHAEL ALBERS MISCELLANOUS EVENT |
|
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION OF NEIL SCHMMER MISCELLANOUS EVENT DECLARATION OF NEIL SCHEMMER |
|
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
OBJECTIONS AND MOTION TO STRIKE Motion - Summary Judgment 2 D/M/SJ SET FOR 1 HOUR BYJEFF SECKEL 214 954-6800 & LIZZETTE PLTF X-M/SJ & RULE 11 ENFORCE SET BY NURA 972 788-1400 |
|
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED AGREED ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED AGREED ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED AGREED ORDER FOR CONTINAUNCE |
|
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
AGREED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE MOTION - CONTINUANCE AGREED |
|
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
4TH AGREED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE MOTION - CONTINUANCE 4TH AGREED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.