Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Dehghani, Parisa, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Alvarez, Robert, Hashemi, Shawn S, Payma, Michael D, against Gomez Floor Covering Inc., Mendez, Jose Juan, represented by Cheatham, Jonathan E, Winslett, Greg K, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 191st District Court with SLAUGHTER, GENA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 11, 2020 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House191st District Court |
ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: June 25, 2020ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: June 11, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: July 15, 2020ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: June 11, 2020SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: February 01, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: June 25, 2020RULE 11
Date: August 24, 2020RULE 11
Date: September 08, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 22, 2021RULE 11
Date: July 29, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 14, 2020RULE 11
Date: August 06, 2020RESPONSE
Date: January 25, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 25, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 22, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 08, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: June 23, 2020Motion - Quash
Date: February 04, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 28, 2022RULE 11
Date: March 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 26, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 14, 2022MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: April 14, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 20, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 14, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 20, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 23, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 21, 2020ISSUE CITATION
Date: June 11, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 23, 2020RULE 11
Date: July 28, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 28, 2021AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 13, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 23, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 23, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 23, 2020MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: November 09, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 09, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 06, 2021ORDER - PRETRIAL
Date: November 17, 2020SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: December 01, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS
Date: December 09, 2022MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: February 16, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 11, 2022DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: January 04, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: January 12, 2022MOTION - QUASH
Date: January 11, 2022SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: August 29, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 19, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 16, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 09, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 13, 2023RESPONSE
Date: April 07, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 04, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 22, 2023MOTION - COMPEL
Date: March 14, 2023SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: March 20, 2023RESPONSE
Date: April 11, 2023ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: April 26, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 02, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 07, 2023Motion - Compel
Date: April 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 23, 2023Motion - Strike
Date: August 11, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: May 31, 2023ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: June 12, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 31, 2023SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS
Date: August 11, 2023RESPONSE
Date: August 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 01, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 15, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 11, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: May 09, 2022SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: July 11, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: January 24, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 11, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 19, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: June 28, 2022RULE 11
Date: September 06, 2022MOTION - STRIKE
Date: July 26, 2023MOTION - STRIKE
Date: July 17, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: July 26, 2023MOTION - QUASH
Date: February 15, 2023RULE 11
Date: March 06, 2023AMENDED PETITION
Date: July 26, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: July 26, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: July 27, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 21, 2023ORDER - SEAL
Date: July 27, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: August 22, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 17, 2023Motion - Seal
Date: August 31, 2023RESPONSE
Date: September 11, 2023AMENDED PETITION
Date: September 12, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 18, 2022SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: September 12, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 11, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: July 19, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 17, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 21, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: August 19, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 15, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 03, 2022MOTION - EMERGENCY
Date: July 25, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 31, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: July 26, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 09, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 09, 2023Motion - Seal
Date: August 03, 2023MOTION - COMPEL
Date: March 14, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: March 21, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: March 21, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 16, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 22, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 16, 2023MOTION - QUASH
Date: June 16, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: May 20, 2024DISCOVERY
Date: April 26, 2023Special Exceptions
Date: September 15, 2023Motion - Strike
Date: August 25, 2023RESPONSE
Date: July 31, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
191st JURY TRIAL LETTER Jury Trial - Civil SPECIAL SETTING- 5-7 DAYS - 54 PANEL JURY |
|
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT EIGHTH SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF FILING |
|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
GOMEZ FLOOR COVERING INC'S SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS Special Exceptions 15M * DEF GOMEZ'S SPCL EXCPTS * KAREN ADAM 214 570 6058 * VIA ZOOM |
|
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
SECOND AMENDED PETITION AMENDED PETITION SECOND |
|
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULING ORDER FIFTH AMENDED AGREED |
|
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLANTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT GOMEZ FLOOR COVERING SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS RESPONSE TO SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS |
|
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER DENYING SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED ORDER DENYING K. HOVANIAN HOMES SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS TO PLANTIFF'S 3RD AMENDED PETITION |
|
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SEAL COURT RECORDS Motion - Seal RE-SET W/ ANDREA MORRELL (972-793-8500) 30MIN EMERGENCY MOTION SEAL **VIA ZOOM & CC BRIEF BINDER* |
|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO MOTION TO STRIKE AND MOTION FOR LEAVE Motion - Strike 30M * PLT'S M/STRIKE * ANDREA MORRREL 972 793 8500 * VIA ZOOM |
|
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE MOTION - CONTINUANCE JOINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.