Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Rhea, Clendon, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Hendrix, Thomas, Mutong, Constance B, Valencia, Camilo, against Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Jenkins, Young C., in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 95th District Court with PURDY, MONICA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 27, 2020 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House95th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a plaintiff's original petition filed by Clendon Rhea against Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. The lawsuit arises from an automobile collision that occurred on January 14, 2019, in Dallas, Texas. The plaintiff alleges t...
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: May 27, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: June 25, 2020REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: May 27, 2020SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: December 05, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: June 25, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: July 15, 2020AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 14, 2020ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: May 27, 2020REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: May 27, 2020ISSUE CITATION
Date: May 27, 2020JURY DEMAND
Date: July 15, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 05, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: October 01, 2020DISCOVERY
Date: October 19, 2020Jury Trial - Civil
Date: August 01, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: October 01, 2020NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT
Date: October 05, 2022NOTE - CLERKS
Date: October 25, 2022DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: June 25, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 08, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 25, 2021TRIAL SETTING (JURY)
Date: August 23, 2021WITNESS LIST
Date: December 02, 2021MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: December 02, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: December 02, 2021PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: December 02, 2021DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: August 25, 2021MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: September 27, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 25, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 02, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 27, 2021EXHIBIT LIST
Date: December 02, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: December 02, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 24, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 09, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 11, 2020NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR
Date: December 05, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 23, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: June 21, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 25, 2022WITNESS LIST
Date: March 25, 2022EXHIBIT LIST
Date: March 25, 2022CHARGE OF COURT
Date: March 25, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 03, 2021MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: March 25, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: March 11, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 09, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 05, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: February 25, 2021NOTICE OF NONSUIT
Date: October 20, 2022DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: June 21, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 20, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF NONSUIT MAILED NOTE - CLERKS |
|
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | REACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE NOTICE OF NONSUIT |
|
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER FOR NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED ORDER FOR NONSUIT |
|
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event | INACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial - Civil Carried from 8/1 docket - Est. 1-2 days |
|
August 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
95TH JURY TRIAL NOTICE I Jury Trial - Civil L2 - Est. 1-2 days. |
|
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE REGARDING NOTICE OF DESIGNATION CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE REGARDING NOTICE OF DESIGNATION |
|
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
DESIGNATION OF LEAD COUNSEL DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.