Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Alarcon, Emma R., Arroyo, Abigail M., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Bauguss, James L, Iii, Hendrix, Thomas, Mutong, Constance B, against Huffstutler, Victoria C., represented by Breeze, Johnny W, Lecrone, Adam B, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 160th District Court with REDMOND, AIESHA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREDMOND, AIESHA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 20, 2020 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House160th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: March 20, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: July 08, 2020DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: May 26, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: May 22, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 08, 2020REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: March 20, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: July 08, 2020Scheduling Conference
Date: July 14, 2020SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: July 15, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 06, 2020AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: March 12, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 22, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 21, 2021DISCOVERY
Date: March 12, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 17, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 26, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: March 20, 2020ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: March 20, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 27, 2020REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: March 20, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: May 22, 2020MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: October 20, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: October 20, 2022DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: May 26, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 11, 2020MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: October 21, 2022SETTLED
Date: December 08, 2022WITNESS LIST
Date: October 20, 2022MOTION - STRIKE
Date: May 04, 2021CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: June 05, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: June 08, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 13, 2021OBJECTION
Date: March 12, 2021MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: July 07, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 12, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 16, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 16, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 04, 2021NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: January 30, 2023DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: May 20, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 06, 2020PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: October 20, 2022EXHIBIT LIST
Date: October 21, 2022WITNESS LIST
Date: October 21, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: October 20, 2022EXHIBIT LIST
Date: October 20, 2022OBJECTION
Date: June 08, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 20, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 08, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: October 07, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 17, 2021VACATION LETTER
Date: November 09, 2020DISCOVERY
Date: October 07, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 17, 2021NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT
Date: December 07, 2022DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: August 26, 2021PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: October 21, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 21, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: December 12, 2022Final Disposition Hearing
Date: January 24, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO PLAINTIFF/DEFENDANTS' ATTORNEYS |
|
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event | REACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Notice Final Disposition Hearing |
|
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event | VACATION LETTER | |
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury/Non-Jury Trial Notice Jury Trial - Civil |
|
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
SETTLED LETTER SETTLED |
|
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event | INACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT LETTER NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT |
|
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT-MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION - IN LIMINE |
|
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT-EXHIBIT LIST EXHIBIT LIST DEFENDANT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.