Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Viva Railings Llc, filed a(n) Other (Civil) case represented by Erikson, Brian W, against Developers Surety And Indemnity Company, represented by Pipkin, Mike Fowler, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 193rd District Court with WHITMORE, BRIDGETT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 13, 2020 |
CategoryOther (Civil) |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House193rd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: March 16, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: June 01, 2020ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: March 13, 2020DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: June 25, 2020DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: May 28, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: March 16, 2020ISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS
Date: March 13, 2020RULE 11
Date: May 08, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: March 30, 2020NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT
Date: June 01, 2020ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: March 13, 2020DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: June 25, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: June 01, 2020DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: May 28, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
193RD Initial Dismissal Notice DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION |
|
June 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
193RD Initial Dismissal Notice DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION |
|
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL | |
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEERAL COURT NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT |
|
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL | |
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEERAL COURT NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT |
|
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
193RD Initial Dismissal Notice DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION 1st REQUEST BY RULE 11 TO RETAIN CASE ON DOCKET FOR 30 DAYS |
|
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
193RD Initial Dismissal Notice DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION 1st REQUEST BY RULE 11 TO RETAIN CASE ON DOCKET FOR 30 DAYS |
|
May 08, 2020 | Docket Event | RULE 11 | |
May 08, 2020 | Docket Event | RULE 11 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.