Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mobley, Jacqueline, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Banahan Nease, Heather V, Rolle, Larry, against Ortiz, Maria, represented by Couch, John, Lawrence, Lauren M, Mok, Jennifer, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 14th District Court with MOYE', ERIC presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 06, 2020 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House14th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: February 06, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: March 12, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: June 12, 2020NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: March 03, 2020SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: March 26, 2020EXHIBIT LIST
Date: March 17, 2022ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: February 06, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: May 31, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: March 02, 2020JURY DEMAND
Date: March 12, 2020DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: October 01, 2021MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: February 18, 2022DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: January 05, 2021PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: February 18, 2022EXHIBIT LIST
Date: February 18, 2022NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: September 07, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 14, 2022PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: March 14, 2022NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: April 20, 2022NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: June 08, 2022NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: March 03, 2020RULE 11
Date: March 13, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: February 18, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: March 13, 2023NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: January 10, 2023ORDER - REINSTATE (OCA and REOPEN CASE)
Date: December 07, 2022Motion - Reinstate
Date: December 08, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 12, 2020NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: March 26, 2020NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: May 19, 2021MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: February 18, 2022WITNESS LIST
Date: March 14, 2022DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: December 29, 2021MOTION - REINSTATE
Date: November 23, 2022ISSUE CITATION
Date: February 06, 2020SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: March 26, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 12, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 12, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 12, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: June 12, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 09, 2020NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: January 22, 2021Motion - Reinstate
Date: December 07, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 10, 2021PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: March 13, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: March 13, 2023PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: March 17, 2023ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: March 12, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 12, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 12, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 22, 2023NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: October 26, 2021DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: February 24, 2023MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: March 14, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: December 01, 2022EXHIBIT LIST
Date: March 14, 2022MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: March 13, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: March 17, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: March 13, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: March 17, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 23, 2022EXHIBIT LIST
Date: March 17, 2022CHARGE OF COURT
Date: March 21, 2023MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: March 17, 2023NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED
Date: October 28, 2022NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED
Date: March 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
MAILED TO HEATHER B NEASE NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED |
|
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event | REACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED JUDGMENT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | CHARGE OF COURT | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | INACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Jury Trial - Civil | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | VOIR DIRE | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | JURY SWORN PANEL (OCA) | |
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
SECOND AMENDED PROPOSED JURY CHARGE - DEFENDANT PROPOSED JURY CHARGE SECOND AMENDED - DEFENDANT |
|
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
SECOND AMENDED WITNESS LIST - DEFENDANT WITNESS LIST SECOND AMENDED - DEFENDANT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.