Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Medina Diaz, Maura, Moreno, Alejandro, Moreno, Francisco, Moreno, Jose Fermin, Moreno Medina, Maria Patricia, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Crump, Benjamin L., Gonzales, Rudy F, Hilliard, Robert Carl, Klager, Bradford P, Reilly, Marion M, (total of 6) See All against Byrum, Michael Scott, Coca-Cola Southwest Beverages Llc, Texas-Cola Leasing Company Lp, Llp, represented by Barrow, Dennis, Cawley, Frank G, Estes, David H, Gradney, Kiara, Henkel, Tyler, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 95th District Court with PURDY, MONICA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2020 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House95th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
MOTION - PROTECT
Date: July 10, 2020REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: January 29, 2020ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: January 29, 2020SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: June 22, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: July 01, 2020AMENDED PETITION
Date: June 09, 2020APPLICATION - TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER
Date: January 29, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: March 09, 2020SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS
Date: July 01, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 10, 2020SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS
Date: July 01, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: March 06, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: July 01, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: October 21, 2020MOTION - PROTECT
Date: July 10, 2020SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: June 22, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: October 21, 2020SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS
Date: July 01, 2020SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS
Date: July 01, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: October 21, 2020COA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER
Date: October 21, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: October 21, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: October 21, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: October 21, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: October 21, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 10, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: October 21, 2020AMENDED PETITION
Date: June 09, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: October 21, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: October 21, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: October 21, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: October 21, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: October 21, 2020ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: January 29, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: March 09, 2020APPLICATION - TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER
Date: January 29, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: October 21, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: October 21, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: October 21, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: October 21, 2020REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: January 29, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: March 06, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 18, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 09, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: October 21, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: October 21, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: October 21, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: October 21, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: October 21, 2020AMENDED PETITION
Date: November 19, 2020RESPONSE
Date: November 18, 2020MOTION - COMPEL
Date: April 26, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: March 19, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 15, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 15, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 14, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 24, 2021Motion - Reconsider
Date: February 12, 2021CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE
Date: March 09, 2021MOTION - QUASH
Date: March 09, 2021NO EVIDENCE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: February 12, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 14, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 03, 2021MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: April 15, 2021TRIAL SETTING (JURY)
Date: March 22, 2021ORDER - DENY
Date: April 19, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 15, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 14, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 14, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 15, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: April 30, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 15, 2021RESPONSE
Date: April 30, 2021SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS
Date: April 29, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 15, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 26, 2021OBJECTION
Date: April 30, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 14, 2021MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: April 12, 2021MOTION - QUASH
Date: March 10, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 14, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 14, 2021MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: April 08, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 21, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 09, 2021Motion - Exclude
Date: April 22, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: March 19, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: April 29, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 15, 2021MOTION - SANCTIONS
Date: April 02, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 04, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 03, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: May 03, 2021MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: May 03, 2021AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: May 03, 2021ORDER - PARTIAL NONSUIT
Date: May 06, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 06, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 14, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 15, 2021RULE 11
Date: March 02, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 16, 2021MOTION - QUASH
Date: April 21, 2021OBJECTION
Date: May 04, 2021RESPONSE
Date: April 30, 2021SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS
Date: April 30, 2021MOTION HEARING
Date: April 16, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 30, 2021ORDER - DENY
Date: May 06, 2021NOTICE OF NONSUIT
Date: May 04, 2021Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: May 07, 2021Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: May 05, 2021OBJECTION
Date: April 30, 2021Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: May 06, 2021RESPONSE
Date: May 04, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 06, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 30, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 06, 2021AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: May 04, 2021MOTION - COMPEL
Date: May 03, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: May 05, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: May 05, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: May 06, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: May 04, 2021Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: May 05, 2021Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: May 07, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 13, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 04, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 14, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: May 17, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 05, 2021AMENDED PETITION
Date: May 07, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 12, 2021RESPONSE
Date: May 17, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: May 07, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 17, 2021RESPONSE
Date: May 17, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 17, 2021RESPONSE
Date: May 18, 2021DISCOVERY
Date: May 14, 2021DISCOVERY
Date: May 21, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: May 18, 2021ORDER - DENY
Date: May 25, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 19, 2021MOTION - PROTECT
Date: May 14, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 21, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 24, 2021RULE 11
Date: June 08, 2021RULE 11
Date: May 19, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 10, 2021MOTION - ENTER ORDER
Date: June 08, 2021Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: May 07, 2021TRIAL SETTING (JURY)
Date: May 28, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 08, 2021PRE-TRIAL HEARING
Date: May 28, 2021OBJECTION
Date: June 01, 2021MOTION - LEAVE
Date: May 13, 2021MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: May 14, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 11, 2021MOTION - LEAVE
Date: June 11, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: June 11, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: June 11, 2021RESPONSE
Date: May 26, 2021AMENDED PETITION
Date: June 14, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 11, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: June 09, 2021MOTION - QUASH
Date: June 11, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 26, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 14, 2021ORDER - DENY
Date: May 25, 2021RESPONSE
Date: June 14, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 14, 2021AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 27, 2021OBJECTION
Date: July 26, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 31, 2021OBJECTION
Date: August 30, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: September 07, 2021SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: June 16, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 07, 2021SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS
Date: August 27, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 30, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 18, 2021ORDER - DENY
Date: May 25, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 25, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: June 21, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: June 21, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 25, 2021MOTION - QUASH
Date: May 24, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: May 25, 2021AMENDED PETITION
Date: June 16, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 09, 2021AMENDED PETITION
Date: August 30, 2021MOTION - EXCLUDE
Date: August 26, 2021ORDER - LEAVE
Date: June 16, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: June 16, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 16, 2021MOTION - EXCLUDE
Date: May 24, 2021Motion - Exclude
Date: September 08, 2021RESPONSE
Date: September 01, 2021MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: September 07, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 20, 2021MOTION HEARING
Date: May 19, 2021CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE
Date: August 24, 2021RULE 11
Date: July 21, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 24, 2021ORDER - DENY
Date: September 14, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 30, 2021Motion - Exclude
Date: September 14, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 16, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 10, 2021ORDER - LEAVE
Date: September 14, 2021ORDER - MISC.
Date: September 14, 2021Motion - Compel
Date: September 02, 2021DISCOVERY
Date: August 03, 2021TRIAL SETTING (JURY)
Date: August 27, 2021AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 27, 2021Motion - Exclude
Date: September 08, 2021RESPONSE
Date: September 10, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 04, 2021MOTION - LEAVE
Date: September 10, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 10, 2021Motion - Exclude
Date: September 08, 2021EXHIBIT LIST
Date: May 26, 2021MOTION - COMPEL
Date: August 20, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 26, 2021MOTION - PROTECT
Date: August 09, 2021MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: September 10, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 20, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 23, 2021RESPONSE
Date: September 10, 2021Jury Trial - Civil
Date: April 18, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 10, 2021MOTION - MODIFY MISC
Date: November 05, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: November 09, 2021MOTION HEARING
Date: September 14, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 05, 2021MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: November 10, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 20, 2021MOTION HEARING
Date: June 16, 2021MOTION - LEAVE
Date: August 30, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 31, 2021MOTION HEARING
Date: November 12, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 30, 2021RESPONSE
Date: November 10, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 01, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 01, 2021MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: November 04, 2021NOTE - CLERKS
Date: November 10, 2021MOTION - DISMISS
Date: November 01, 2021Special Setting
Date: April 18, 2022ORDER - DENY
Date: December 07, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 10, 2021MOTION HEARING
Date: November 11, 2021Motion - Compel
Date: November 19, 2020MOTION - COMPEL
Date: November 09, 2020ORDER - PROTECT
Date: July 13, 2020JURY DEMAND
Date: January 29, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: February 20, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: February 20, 2020NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR
Date: February 07, 2020ISSUE CITATION
Date: January 29, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: March 06, 2020DISCOVERY
Date: June 10, 2020TRIAL SETTING (JURY)
Date: June 22, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 13, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 13, 2020DISCOVERY
Date: May 14, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 13, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 23, 2020DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: May 04, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 30, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 23, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 05, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 08, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: February 20, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 13, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 03, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 14, 2020DISCOVERY
Date: June 22, 2020DISCOVERY
Date: July 06, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 13, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 04, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 03, 2020AMENDED PETITION
Date: December 07, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: October 21, 2020MOTION - COMPEL
Date: December 28, 2020MOTION - COMPEL
Date: December 28, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: November 10, 2020MOTION - COMPEL
Date: December 28, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 14, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 04, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 04, 2021DISCOVERY
Date: January 06, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: January 05, 2021DISCOVERY
Date: April 16, 2020DISCOVERY
Date: October 01, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 28, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 05, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 07, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 13, 2020RESPONSE
Date: January 26, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 03, 2020MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: January 14, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 19, 2021MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: January 14, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 04, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 23, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 19, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 19, 2020MOTION - RECONSIDER
Date: February 05, 2021ORDER - RECONSIDER
Date: January 28, 2021MOTION HEARING
Date: February 12, 2021Motion - Reconsider
Date: January 27, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 08, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 20, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: January 12, 2021ORDER - DENY
Date: January 28, 2021MOTION - RECONSIDER
Date: January 08, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 04, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: January 19, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 04, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 05, 2021RESPONSE
Date: January 28, 2021MOTION - PRO HAC VICE
Date: January 13, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 04, 2020ORDER - GRANTING PRO HAC VICE
Date: January 21, 2021MOTION - EXCLUDE
Date: February 22, 2021NO EVIDENCE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: February 12, 2021MOTION - EXCLUDE
Date: February 22, 2021MOTION - COMPEL
Date: December 28, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: March 19, 2021RULE 11
Date: February 09, 2021Motion - Exclude
Date: March 02, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 10, 2021RULE 11
Date: February 26, 2021OBJECTION
Date: March 12, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: March 19, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: March 19, 2021MOTION - STAY
Date: February 05, 2021MOTION - QUASH
Date: January 26, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 26, 2021AMENDED PETITION
Date: February 01, 2021MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: February 12, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: February 24, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 19, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 19, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 26, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 24, 2021RESPONSE
Date: April 15, 2021NO EVIDENCE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: February 12, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: February 22, 2021MOTION - EMERGENCY
Date: February 24, 2021RESPONSE
Date: April 01, 2021OBJECTION
Date: March 05, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 08, 2021MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: February 05, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: April 01, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: April 14, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: March 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
95TH JURY TRIAL NOTICE I Jury Trial - Civil L3 - Est. 10 days |
|
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
95TH JURY TRIAL NOTICE I Special Setting |
|
April 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL HEARING (In person) |
|
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER - DENY PLTF/AMENDED MOTION MODIFY PROTECTIVE ORDER ORDER - DENY PLTF/AMENDED MOTION TO MODIFY THE PROTECT ORDER |
|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER DENY PLTF/AMENDED MOTION MODIFY MOTION HEARING RE-SET W/ NORMA MARTINEZ (361-882-1612) 15MIN PLTF/MOTION MODIFY PROTECT ORDER FILED 11/4/21 **VIA ZOOM** |
|
November 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER MOTION HEARING NORMA MARTINEZ (361-882-1612) 15MIN PLTF/MOTION MODIFY PROTECT ORDER FILED ON 11/4/21 **VIA ZOOM** |
|
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
APPENDIX TO JOINT RESPONSE TO PLTF/AMENDED MOTION MODIFY MISCELLANOUS EVENT |
|
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
JOINT RESPONSE TO PLTF/AMENDED MOTION MODIFY RESPONSE |
|
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
MAILED AGREED DISMISSAL TO CARMEN S MITCHELL NOTE - CLERKS MAILED ORDER TO ALL PARTIES |
|
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER DENY PLTF/AMENDED MOTION MODIFY NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.