Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ventura, Liberato, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Link, Felipe B., against Landon Homes, Lp, Linares, William, Raymundo, Milton, represented by Sloan, John D, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 14th District Court with MOYE', ERIC presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2020 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House14th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 17, 2020ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: January 13, 2020MOTION - LEAVE
Date: June 17, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: February 10, 2020SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: February 24, 2020RULE 11
Date: June 23, 2020MOTION - PROTECT
Date: April 01, 2020MOTION - TRANSFER - CHANGE OF VENUE
Date: February 10, 2020AMENDED PETITION
Date: June 17, 2020RULE 11
Date: June 23, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: February 10, 2020MOTION - TRANSFER - CHANGE OF VENUE
Date: February 10, 2020MOTION - PROTECT
Date: April 01, 2020SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: October 08, 2020ORDER - LEAVE
Date: July 10, 2020MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: October 07, 2020AMENDED PETITION
Date: June 17, 2020ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: January 13, 2020MOTION - LEAVE
Date: June 17, 2020SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: February 24, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 07, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 17, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 28, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 28, 2020NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: February 24, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 08, 2020MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: September 16, 2021EXHIBIT LIST
Date: September 16, 2021PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: September 16, 2021NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: May 11, 2021WITNESS LIST
Date: September 16, 2021DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 16, 2021WITNESS LIST
Date: September 16, 2021NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: October 04, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 15, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: January 13, 2020JURY DEMAND
Date: April 20, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: March 18, 2020NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: October 08, 2020ISSUE CITATION
Date: June 17, 2020NOTE - CLERKS
Date: November 17, 2021MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: November 29, 2021ORDER - PARTIAL DISMISSAL
Date: November 17, 2021NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED
Date: November 30, 2021RETURNED MAIL
Date: December 16, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: October 20, 2021MOTION - NONSUIT
Date: November 17, 2021MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: September 16, 2021MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: September 16, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 29, 2021RETURNED MAIL
Date: December 29, 2021MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: December 29, 2021ORDER - TURNOVER
Date: January 24, 2022PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: September 16, 2021AMENDED PETITION
Date: November 17, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 17, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Jury Trial - Civil | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER - TURNOVER | |
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR TURNOVER NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT - SENT TO MILTON RAYMUNDO RETURNED MAIL |
|
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR TURNOVER ORDER MOTION - MISCELLANOUS TURNOVER ORDER |
|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT - SENT TO WILLIAM LINARES RETURNED MAIL NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT - SENT O WILLIAM LINARES |
|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
FP NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT RULE 239(a) NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED |
|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
MAILED TO JOHN SLOAN NOTE - CLERKS COPY OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL ORDER MAILED TO PLTF AND DEF. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.