Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Daoudi, Samir, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Hamideh, Khalid Y, Harter, Kenneth Stuart, against Kim, Alexander, Klalib, Abdulrhman, represented by Francis, Paul T, Jun, Moses, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 193rd District Court with WHITMORE, BRIDGETT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2019 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House193rd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: May 21, 2020AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: May 18, 2020AMENDED PETITION
Date: February 28, 2020ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: December 27, 2019ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 24, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 14, 2020NO EVIDENCE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: April 21, 2020Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: May 07, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 21, 2020MOTION - DISBURSE FUNDS
Date: January 29, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 29, 2020OBJECTION
Date: May 14, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: February 11, 2020ORDER - JUDGMENT
Date: May 21, 2020AMENDED PETITION
Date: April 21, 2020MOTION - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: January 16, 2020ISSUE CITATION
Date: December 27, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2020ORDER - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: January 21, 2020ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: December 27, 2019MOTION - DISBURSE FUNDS
Date: January 29, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 15, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 29, 2020COUNTER CLAIM
Date: February 21, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 16, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: February 11, 2020TRUST RECEIPT
Date: January 24, 2020COUNTER CLAIM
Date: January 24, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 21, 2020OBJECTION
Date: May 14, 2020Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: May 07, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 23, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 15, 2020RESPONSE
Date: February 27, 2020AMENDED PETITION
Date: April 21, 2020NO EVIDENCE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: April 21, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 24, 2020MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: July 16, 2020MOTION - SEVER
Date: June 15, 2020MOTION - QUASH
Date: July 06, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 31, 2020ORDER - JUDGMENT
Date: May 21, 2020AMENDED PETITION
Date: February 28, 2020MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: September 03, 2020AMENDED PETITION
Date: May 26, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: May 26, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: June 26, 2020AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: September 09, 2020Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: May 21, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 14, 2020JURY DEMAND
Date: May 14, 2020RESPONSE
Date: August 12, 2020AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: May 18, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 03, 2020MOTION - COMPEL
Date: October 05, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 06, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: July 17, 2020ORDER - SEVER
Date: September 14, 2020RESPONSE
Date: October 29, 2020MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: July 16, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 26, 2020NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS
Date: June 10, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 10, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: May 26, 2020RESPONSE
Date: October 26, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 13, 2020Motion - Sever
Date: September 14, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 07, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 16, 2020AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: September 04, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 13, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: September 09, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: November 17, 2020ORDER - JUDGMENT
Date: November 13, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 16, 2020CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE
Date: November 17, 2020NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED
Date: November 16, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 26, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 19, 2020MOTION - COMPEL
Date: December 11, 2020MOTION - COMPEL
Date: December 31, 2020REQUEST CLERK PREPARE RECORD
Date: February 26, 2021RESPONSE
Date: October 29, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 08, 2020MOTION HEARING
Date: August 13, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 16, 2020CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE
Date: December 02, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 29, 2020OBJECTION
Date: October 29, 2020OBJECTION
Date: January 19, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 28, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: December 17, 2020Motion - Reconsider
Date: December 17, 2020SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD PAYMENT INVOICE
Date: March 03, 2021OBJECTION
Date: November 16, 2020RESPONSE
Date: November 19, 2020MOTION - COMPEL
Date: November 16, 2020MOTION - RECONSIDER
Date: December 01, 2020Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: November 02, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 02, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: January 21, 2021ORDER - COMPEL
Date: November 20, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 19, 2020Motion - Compel
Date: November 19, 2020Motion - Reconsider
Date: January 21, 2021Jury Trial - Civil
Date: February 23, 2021NOTICE OF APPEAL - CT. OF APPEALS
Date: February 25, 2021REQUEST CLERK PREPARE RECORD
Date: March 02, 2021APPELLATE RECORD
Date: March 09, 20215TH COA ORDER
Date: March 26, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 15, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 13, 2021APPELLATE RECORD
Date: March 05, 2021MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: January 15, 2021RESPONSE
Date: December 16, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 31, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: January 22, 2021RESPONSE
Date: January 19, 2021CLERK'S RECORD PAYMENT INVOICE
Date: March 01, 2021COA - POST CARD
Date: March 10, 2021COA - POST CARD
Date: March 09, 2021RESPONSE
Date: April 30, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 26, 2021MOTION - RELEASE FUNDS
Date: August 13, 2021COA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER
Date: March 26, 2021RESPONSE
Date: September 15, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: September 02, 2021MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: May 03, 2021PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: December 02, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: December 03, 2021EXHIBIT LIST
Date: December 02, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: December 29, 2021WITNESS LIST
Date: December 02, 2021RULE 166
Date: April 14, 2022WITNESS LIST
Date: April 14, 2022EXHIBIT LIST
Date: April 19, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: April 19, 2022Motion - Release Funds
Date: September 16, 2021INTERVENTION
Date: April 15, 2022MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: April 14, 2022EXHIBIT LIST
Date: April 14, 2022PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: April 14, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: December 07, 2021CHARGE OF COURT
Date: April 13, 2022EXHIBIT LIST
Date: April 13, 2022WITNESS LIST
Date: April 13, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 14, 2022MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: May 09, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 09, 2022MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: December 02, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 02, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: May 25, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 22, 2022MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: November 04, 2022PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: April 18, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: February 20, 2023RESPONSE
Date: March 20, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: June 07, 2022PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: November 04, 2022ORDER - JUDGMENT
Date: March 30, 2023MOTION - RELEASE FUNDS
Date: May 19, 2023Motion - Compel
Date: May 03, 2021NO EVIDENCE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: February 14, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: November 08, 2022Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: March 20, 2023NOTICE OF NONSUIT
Date: June 12, 2023Motion - Release Funds
Date: June 12, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 22, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: May 23, 2023NOTE - CLERKS
Date: June 13, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 02, 2023TRUST RECEIPT
Date: June 21, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 02, 2023ORDER - DISBURSE FUNDS
Date: June 12, 2023ORDER - NONSUIT
Date: June 12, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: August 25, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 24, 2023MOTION - VACATE
Date: June 12, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 12, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: May 23, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 12, 2023ORDER - DENY
Date: August 24, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 23, 2023Motion - Vacate
Date: August 24, 2023RESPONSE
Date: August 23, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 24, 2023RESPONSE
Date: February 27, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
E-Serve Orders Cover Letter MISCELLANOUS EVENT DC-19-20481 ORDER DENYING (PL) MTN VACATE ORDER GRANTING SJ |
|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING VACATE INTERLOCUTORY SJ NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING VACATE INTERLOCUTORYT SJ |
|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER DENYING MTN VACATE ORDER GRANTING SJ ORDER - DENY ORDER DENYING (PL) MTN VACATE ORDER GRANTING SJ |
|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT (KIM) AMD RESPONSE TO (PL) MTN VACATE JUDGMENT Motion - Vacate SET FOR 15 MINS BY KEN HARTER 972 752-1928 **VIA ZOOM** |
|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER DENYING MTN VACATE ORDER GRANTING SJ NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT (KIM) RESPONSE TO (PL) VACATE JUDGMENT CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE |
|
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT (KIM) AMD RESPONSE TO (PL) MTN VACATE JUDGMENT RESPONSE DEFENDANT (KIM) AMD RESPO TO (PL) MTN VACATE JUDGMENT |
|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING RE: PLAINTIFF MTN VACATE SJ NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT RE: PLAINITFF MTN VACATE SJ |
|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING (PL) MTN VACATE INTERLOCUTORY SJ NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | TRUST RECEIPT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.