Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Horton, Anthony, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Beagley, Brandon L., Judkins, Savannah Marie, Runge, Carson R., against Brown, Marquis K, Buho One Trucking Llc, Villeda Alvarado, Jesus, represented by Bassett, Michael H, Capehart, Ron, Echols, Charlene R, Ekvall, Erik E, Ramirez, Richard, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 191st District Court with SLAUGHTER, GENA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2019 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedSeptember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House191st District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
MOTION - LEAVE
Date: March 23, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 13, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: April 13, 2020ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: December 23, 2019ORDER - LEAVE
Date: April 14, 2020REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: April 21, 2020AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: March 10, 2020ORDER - PRETRIAL
Date: April 01, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: February 24, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 21, 2020MOTION - LEAVE
Date: March 23, 2020SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS
Date: February 26, 2020RETURNED MAIL
Date: February 12, 2020ISSUE CITATION
Date: July 23, 2021REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: July 23, 2021ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: December 23, 2019AMENDED PETITION
Date: July 07, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 13, 2020MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: October 27, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 05, 2021Motion - Leave
Date: May 11, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: December 11, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: February 25, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 06, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 30, 2021DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: December 21, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 04, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: November 05, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 10, 2021MOTION - DISMISS
Date: November 11, 2022AMENDED PETITION
Date: August 25, 2022DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: November 08, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 28, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 17, 2020SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS
Date: March 10, 2020MOTION - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: March 27, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: April 21, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 27, 2020ORDER - LEAVE
Date: April 14, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 21, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 25, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 19, 2021MOTION - LEAVE
Date: January 27, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 28, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: July 07, 2021ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: July 20, 2021MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: July 06, 2021AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: May 21, 2021AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: May 21, 2021MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: August 11, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 03, 2021MOTION - QUASH
Date: March 21, 2022MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: February 17, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 17, 2022RULE 11
Date: August 24, 2022CITATION ISSUED
Date: August 23, 2021MOTION - QUASH
Date: April 29, 2022ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: November 17, 2021RULE 11
Date: August 24, 2022ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: March 11, 2022JURY DEMAND
Date: August 17, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 04, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 25, 2020SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: April 01, 2021REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: February 18, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: April 09, 2020ISSUE CITATION
Date: January 17, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: February 24, 2020AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: March 10, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: April 13, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: February 12, 2020ORDER - PRETRIAL
Date: April 01, 2020ORDER - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: April 03, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 26, 2020NOTE - CLERKS
Date: November 21, 2022MOTION - QUASH
Date: August 19, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 11, 2022MOTION - QUASH
Date: April 07, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 12, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 13, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: November 17, 2021SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: August 11, 2021Jury Trial - Civil
Date: January 30, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
191st JURY TRIAL LETTER Jury Trial - Civil |
|
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
MAILED ORDER DISMISS NOTE - CLERKS MAILED ORDER - DISMISS |
|
November 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS MOTION - DISMISS |
|
November 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER MOTION TO DISMISS NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
DESIGNATION OF LEAD COUNSEL DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL |
|
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
SECOND AMENDED PETITION AMENDED PETITION SECOND |
|
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
RULE 11 AGREEMENT RULE 11 AGREEMENT - DEADLINES |
|
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
RULE 11 AGREEMENT RULE 11 AGREEMENT - DISCOVERY |
|
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
PLTS MTN TO QUASH MOTION - QUASH |
|
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
THIRD AMENDED AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.