Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Brown, Rodney, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Duke, Walker M, Seth, Gagandeep K., against Bautista, Irma, Bautista, Reynaldo, represented by Alaniz, Oscar, Bobier, Kila Lynn, Martinez, Fernando, Jr, Martinez, Fernando, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 116th District Court with PARKER, TONYA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePARKER, TONYA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 18, 2019 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedDecember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House116th District Court |
This complaint is a plaintiff's original petition filed by Rodney Brown against defendants Reynaldo Bautista and Irma Bautista in the District Court of the 116th Judicial District in Dallas County, Texas. The plaintiff seeks monetary damages greater ...
SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: January 10, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 17, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 07, 2020ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: October 18, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 07, 2020DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: August 24, 2020SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: January 10, 2020ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: October 18, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 17, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 11, 2021MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: October 11, 2021MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: January 04, 2022MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: December 22, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 04, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 22, 2021ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: October 18, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 07, 2020DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: October 27, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 11, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: November 12, 2019JURY DEMAND
Date: November 13, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: October 25, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 08, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: October 25, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 20, 2020Jury Trial - Civil
Date: April 05, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: October 27, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 28, 2021DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: December 22, 2021DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: February 01, 2021ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: January 11, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: April 18, 2022EXHIBIT LIST
Date: April 15, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: April 15, 2022PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: December 22, 2021Scheduling Conference
Date: January 15, 2020ISSUE CITATION
Date: October 18, 2019MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: August 23, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: August 25, 2023NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS
Date: March 28, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: October 05, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: May 31, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: December 01, 2022EXHIBIT LIST
Date: April 18, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 19, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 25, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: March 20, 2023ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: October 10, 2022PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: August 25, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: October 05, 2022MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: August 25, 2023MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: August 25, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: August 25, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 25, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: May 30, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: July 19, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 20, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: December 11, 2023ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: March 22, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 05, 2022ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: July 20, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: December 11, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: July 25, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: October 10, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: March 27, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: June 05, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: August 28, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
116th Jury Trial Notice Jury Trial - Civil 2 DAYS .COURT NOTEBOOK |
|
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
116th Jury Trial Notice Jury Trial - Civil 1 TO 2 DAYS .COURT NOTEBOOK |
|
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Jury Trial - Civil | |
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Notice Jury Trial - Civil 1 TO 2 DAYS .COURT NOTEBOOK |
|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANTS WITNESS LIST WITNESS LIST DEFENDANTS |
|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANTS PROPOSED JURY CHARGE OF THE COURT PROPOSED JURY CHARGE DEFENDANTS |
|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION - IN LIMINE |
|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION - IN LIMINE AMENDED |
|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANTS EXHIBIT LIST EXHIBIT LIST DEFENDANTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.