Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lara, Alfonso, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Galvan, Sabrina L, Olivarez, Saul G., against Pindi, Dayakar, represented by Whitcomb, Scott A, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 160th District Court with REDMOND, AIESHA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREDMOND, AIESHA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 30, 2019 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House160th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: October 10, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 26, 2019ISSUE CITATION
Date: August 30, 2019DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: November 05, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: January 16, 2020JURY DEMAND
Date: October 10, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: January 02, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 09, 2019SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: December 03, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 26, 2019ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: August 30, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 09, 2019AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: May 20, 2020Scheduling Conference
Date: December 10, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: May 15, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 20, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 04, 2020OBJECTION
Date: June 04, 2020ORDER - LEAVE
Date: June 17, 2020MOTION - LEAVE
Date: May 20, 2020RESPONSE
Date: July 02, 2020DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: July 27, 2020WITNESS LIST
Date: August 05, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 05, 2020PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: August 05, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: July 30, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: September 10, 2020MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: August 05, 2020MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: October 22, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: July 02, 2020MOTION - STRIKE
Date: July 28, 2020EXHIBIT LIST
Date: August 05, 2020OBJECTION
Date: August 05, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 17, 2020ORDER - STRIKE
Date: September 02, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 26, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 31, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 05, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 11, 2020Motion - Strike
Date: August 27, 2020MOTION - STRIKE
Date: September 09, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 29, 2020EXHIBIT LIST
Date: October 22, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: June 01, 2021NOTICE OF NONSUIT
Date: August 31, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 31, 2021OBJECTION
Date: September 17, 2020DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: October 22, 2020MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: October 30, 2020ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: November 10, 2020DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: April 16, 2021RULE 11
Date: August 16, 2021Motion - Strike
Date: October 29, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 30, 2020Jury Trial - Civil
Date: August 30, 2021NOTE - CLERKS
Date: August 31, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NONSUIT | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
NON SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER-ORDER OF NONSUIT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT ORDER OF NONSUIT |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
COVER SHEET NOTE - CLERKS MAILED COVER SHEETS AND ORDER OF NONSUIT TO PLAINTIFF/DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEYS |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Jury/Non-Jury Trial Notice Jury Trial - Civil |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
RULE 11 SETTLEMENT LETTER RULE 11 |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
LETTER - FIRM NAME CHANGE CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE FIRM NAME CHANGE |
|
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
DESIGNATE OF LEAD COUNSEL AND REMOVAL OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL AND REMOVAL OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD |
|
November 10, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE | |
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Jury Trial - Civil | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER - STRIKE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.