Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Lobes, Jessica R, against Jf Valet Llc, represented by Williams, Douglas Kent, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 160th District Court with REDMOND, AIESHA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 05, 2019 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedSeptember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House160th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 05, 2019DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: September 03, 2019ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 23, 2019SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: October 01, 2019ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 05, 2019NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS
Date: July 23, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 14, 2019ISSUE CITATION
Date: July 05, 2019CASE FILING COVER SHEET
Date: July 05, 2019Final Disposition Hearing
Date: January 12, 2021NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED
Date: December 14, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 27, 2019SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: October 01, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 26, 2020Scheduling Conference
Date: October 08, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 02, 2020SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: June 03, 2020MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: August 31, 2020MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: August 25, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 23, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 28, 2020MOTION - MEDIATION
Date: September 28, 2020DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: September 03, 2019ORDER - MEDIATION
Date: October 20, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 01, 2020NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT
Date: December 01, 2020ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: September 10, 2020CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE
Date: October 08, 2020Non Jury Trial
Date: December 07, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Notice Final Disposition Hearing |
|
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
FP NOTICE OF JUDGMENT RULE 306(a)(3) NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED |
|
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | REACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Jury/Non-Jury Trial Notice Non Jury Trial SETTLED PER DEF. |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
CONSENT JUDGMENT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT CONSENT JUDMENT |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | INACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER - MEDIATION REFER CASE TO MEDIATION |
|
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE ON MOTION TO REFER CAUSE TO MEDIATION |
|
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER ON MOTION TO REFER CAUSE TO MEDIATION NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.