Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Gorenstein, Andrew, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Orleans, Neil Jeffrey, against Oneup Games Llc, Oneup Sports Llc, Rizvi, Omar, Trousdell, Daren, Willacy, Vanessa, (total of 5) See All represented by Thompson, Grady Ross, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 95th District Court with EVANS, DAVID presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 26, 2019 |
CategoryForeign Judgment (Cv) |
Last RefreshedOctober 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Filing Court House95th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Motion - Transfer
Date: September 13, 2019ORDER - DISMISSAL
Date: September 12, 2019ORDER - TRANSFER
Date: September 30, 2019ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: June 26, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: June 26, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 26, 2019MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: June 26, 2019MOTION - STAY
Date: July 09, 2019MOTION - DISMISS
Date: September 10, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 10, 2019RESPONSE
Date: July 10, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 09, 2019MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: June 26, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: July 05, 2019MOTION - TRANSFER - CHANGE OF VENUE
Date: July 02, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 08, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - TRANSFER AGREED |
|
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - TRANSFER AGREED |
|
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
RIZVI.OMAR Motion - Transfer SET BY ELIZABETH 972-542-1251 |
|
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion - Transfer SET BY ELIZABETH 972-542-1251 |
|
September 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
September 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR to clerk: Order-signed 9/12/20190-close |
|
September 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR to clerk: Order-signed 9/12/20190-close |
|
September 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
September 10, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION - DISMISS | |
September 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER TO DISMISS NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.