Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Herrera, Imelda, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Maldonado, David, against Carrillo, Omar, represented by Smith, Kyle L, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 162nd District Court with MOORE, MARICELA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 15, 2019 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House162nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: April 22, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: June 28, 2019SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: June 12, 2019NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED
Date: May 08, 2020MOTION - DISMISS
Date: May 04, 2020RESPONSE
Date: September 26, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: March 15, 2019ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: March 15, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 04, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: June 28, 2019ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: April 22, 2019ISSUE CITATION
Date: March 15, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 24, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 24, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 24, 2019JURY DEMAND
Date: April 22, 2019CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: April 22, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 24, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 24, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 24, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 13, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 24, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 24, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 26, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: December 20, 2019DISCOVERY
Date: December 20, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 27, 2019Jury Trial - Civil
Date: June 16, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: March 29, 2019ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: March 15, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 24, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: March 15, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 24, 2019RESPONSE
Date: September 26, 2019CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: September 26, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 24, 2019SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: June 12, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 24, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: February 13, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 04, 2020NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED
Date: May 08, 2020MOTION - DISMISS
Date: May 04, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
162ND JURY TRAIL RESET LETTER Jury Trial - Civil |
|
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Jury Trial - Civil | |
May 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
FP NOTICE OF JUDGMENT RULE 306(a)(3) NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED |
|
May 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF JUDGMENT RULE 306(a)(3) NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED |
|
May 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR O/DISMISS TO JUDGE |
|
May 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR O/DISMISS TO JUDGE |
|
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS MOTION - DISMISS |
|
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT DISMISSAL |
|
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT DISMISSAL |
|
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS MOTION - DISMISS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.