Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mabanta, Sheilaine, Md, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Leboeuf, Nicole T, against Echt, Gregory A., Md, Gregory A. Echt, M.D., P.A., represented by Herring, Walter Andrew, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 68th District Court with HOFFMAN, MARTIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2018 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House68th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: October 14, 2019ORDER - MEDIATION
Date: June 13, 2019SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: August 06, 2019RESPONSE
Date: April 20, 2020MOTION - COMPEL
Date: April 13, 2020COUNTER CLAIM
Date: August 30, 2019SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: December 13, 2019MOTION - PROTECT
Date: January 24, 2020AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 30, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 17, 2020MOTION - COMPEL
Date: March 30, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 15, 2020ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: December 11, 2018DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: April 13, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 06, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: April 07, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 14, 2020DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: February 28, 2020AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: April 13, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 24, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 24, 2020RESPONSE
Date: April 15, 2020AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: April 27, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 23, 2020RESPONSE
Date: April 24, 2020ORDER - PROTECT
Date: December 05, 2019ORDER - PROTECT
Date: November 18, 2019MOTION - PROTECT
Date: January 23, 2020Motion - Compel
Date: April 27, 2020MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: February 11, 2020SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: December 13, 2019ORDER - MEDIATION
Date: June 13, 2019SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: August 06, 2019CASE FILING COVER SHEET
Date: December 11, 2018AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 30, 2019NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS
Date: February 18, 2019COUNTER CLAIM
Date: August 30, 2019ORDER - PROTECT
Date: June 26, 2019DISCOVERY
Date: January 06, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 09, 2019MOTION - PROTECT
Date: January 24, 2020Non Jury Trial
Date: October 29, 2019Motion - Protect
Date: October 21, 2019DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: February 28, 2020MOTION - PROTECT
Date: January 23, 2020ORDER - PROTECT
Date: November 18, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 12, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 02, 2020RESPONSE
Date: April 20, 2020CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE
Date: April 01, 2020AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: April 13, 2020RESPONSE
Date: April 24, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 24, 2020JURY DEMAND
Date: June 09, 2020AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: April 27, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 02, 2020ORDER - COMPEL
Date: July 17, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 12, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: September 13, 2019ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: October 14, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: September 17, 2019MOTION - COMPEL
Date: April 13, 2020RESPONSE
Date: April 15, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 15, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: April 07, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 14, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 17, 2020MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: April 20, 2020MOTION - COMPEL
Date: March 30, 2020MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: February 11, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 24, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 06, 2020Non Jury Trial
Date: March 24, 2020DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: April 13, 2020Motion - Compel
Date: April 27, 2020Non Jury Trial
Date: August 25, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 08, 2020Jury Trial - Civil
Date: February 09, 2021RESPONSE
Date: June 07, 2021MOTION - COMPEL
Date: May 21, 2021MOTION - LEAVE
Date: May 14, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: May 27, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 29, 2021MOTION - LEAVE
Date: April 30, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: June 04, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 21, 2021NO EVIDENCE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: June 21, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 11, 2021RESPONSE
Date: June 10, 2021MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: June 02, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: June 10, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 07, 2020ORDER - MISC.
Date: July 13, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 11, 2021SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: January 04, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 30, 2021Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: August 02, 2021RESPONSE
Date: July 08, 2021ORDER - MISC.
Date: July 13, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 11, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 21, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 02, 2021ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: August 03, 2021MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: July 26, 2021RULE 11
Date: July 21, 2021AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: July 26, 2021MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: July 30, 2021ORDER - LEAVE
Date: July 26, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 08, 2021MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: June 21, 2021AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 13, 2021RESPONSE
Date: July 29, 2021MOTION - QUASH
Date: June 14, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 18, 2022MOTION - LEAVE
Date: June 10, 2021RULE 11
Date: January 28, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 14, 2021Jury Trial - Civil
Date: August 24, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 11, 2021OBJECTION
Date: July 08, 2021MOTION - LEAVE
Date: July 06, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: June 25, 2021ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: October 15, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 08, 2021RULE 11
Date: October 13, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: February 09, 2022RESPONSE
Date: March 21, 2022MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: March 16, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 04, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: March 11, 2022RESPONSE
Date: March 18, 2022RESPONSE
Date: March 09, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 01, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: March 14, 2022MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: January 28, 2022Motion - Continuance
Date: February 21, 2022MOTION - QUASH
Date: December 22, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 25, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: November 09, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 23, 2021OBJECTION
Date: July 08, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 30, 2021MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: October 08, 2021AMENDED PETITION
Date: September 20, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 30, 2021MOTION - SEAL
Date: March 11, 2022RESPONSE
Date: April 18, 2022EXHIBIT LIST
Date: March 21, 2022MOTION HEARING
Date: March 21, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 04, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: March 16, 2022Motion - Leave
Date: April 25, 2022Motion - Seal
Date: May 16, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 10, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 20, 2022RESPONSE
Date: April 21, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 31, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 04, 2022AMENDED PETITION
Date: March 30, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 18, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 15, 2022MOTION - SANCTIONS
Date: March 16, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: March 11, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: March 14, 2022BRIEF FILED
Date: March 21, 2022MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: March 21, 2022DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: June 13, 2022MOTION - LEAVE
Date: March 30, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: March 22, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 31, 2022NOTE - CLERKS
Date: June 02, 2022Motion - Sanctions
Date: May 16, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: June 14, 2022MOTION - EXCLUDE
Date: March 21, 2022Motion - Protect
Date: October 28, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 22, 2019MOTION - PROTECT
Date: September 12, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: October 21, 2019ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: December 11, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 24, 2019CITATION ISSUED
Date: December 12, 2018SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS
Date: February 11, 2019MOTION - PROTECT
Date: September 16, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 16, 2019ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: February 11, 2019ORDER - PROTECT
Date: December 05, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 23, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
68th Court-Jury Trial Setting Jury Trial - Civil 7TH TRL RESET - **SPECIAL SETTING** ATTYS AGREED TO 6 PER JURY IF STILL IN RED - MLD NTCS TO ALL PARTIES |
|
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Notice DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION 1ST SETTING ON DWOP - CASE SETTLED MLD NTCS TO ALL PARTIES |
|
June 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL ORDER MAILED TO ALL NOTE - CLERKS |
|
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED JOINT AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR FWD SIGNED DISML ORDER TO CLERKS |
|
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR FWD DISML ORDER TO JUDGE FOR REV |
|
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
JOINT MOTION TO SEAL COURT RECORDS Motion - Seal *JOINT *FILED 3/11/22 *30M *SET BY ANDREW J., 214/624-9803 |
|
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SANCTIONS & EXCLUDE EVIDENCE Motion - Sanctions AND TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE / 1HR / 214-624-9803 ALEXANDRA PAYNE |
|
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION - BARBARA WALSH CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION BARBARA WALSH |
|
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED PETITION Motion - Leave *TO FILE SECOND AMENDED PETITION *FILED 3/30/22 *15M *SET BY ANDREW J., 214/624-9803 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.