Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Washington, Carla, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Bebawi, Jessica, Briscoe, Willie C, Mcalpine, Kiernan, Samavati, Gia, against Oc Risk Management Services Llc, Primrose Houston South Housing, L.P., represented by Bezney, Paul A., Prilliman, Larissa, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 44th District Court with FRAZIER, VERETTA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2018 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House44th District Court |
ORDER - DENY
Date: May 27, 2020RESPONSE
Date: April 02, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 25, 2020MOTION - SANCTIONS
Date: March 11, 2020MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: February 25, 2020ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: May 27, 2020Motion - Continuance
Date: May 27, 2020ORDER - SETTING SCHEDULING CONF
Date: January 30, 2019RULE 11
Date: March 14, 2019SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: February 22, 2019ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 28, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 02, 2020ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: December 06, 2018MOTION - REINSTATE
Date: October 12, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 12, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: November 12, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 29, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 29, 2021MOTION - SANCTIONS
Date: March 11, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 12, 2020DISCOVERY
Date: April 09, 2020MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: January 12, 2021ORDER - DENY
Date: January 28, 2022MOTION HEARING
Date: January 28, 2022RESPONSE
Date: November 30, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 30, 2021DISCOVERY
Date: March 29, 2022Motion - Reinstate
Date: December 03, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 02, 2020DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: April 25, 2022DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: April 13, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 19, 2020DEPUTY REPORTER STATEMENT
Date: May 27, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 30, 2020MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: January 20, 2021NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: January 20, 2021MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: August 18, 2021MEDIATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT
Date: July 20, 2021RESPONSE
Date: June 09, 2022OBJECTION
Date: September 15, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 20, 2021MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: May 17, 2022Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: June 10, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: December 28, 2021NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: February 18, 2022AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: February 21, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: February 28, 2022MOTION - MODIFY MISC
Date: December 21, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 21, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 21, 2021RESPONSE
Date: June 07, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 07, 2022MOTION - COMPEL
Date: November 01, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: November 03, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 13, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 01, 2022AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: April 26, 2022Motion - Compel
Date: November 09, 2022MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: January 12, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 09, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: November 22, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 17, 2023ORDER - COMPEL
Date: November 11, 2022DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: December 21, 2022DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: May 26, 2022RULE 11
Date: June 06, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: May 19, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 17, 2022DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: November 03, 2022RESPONSE
Date: November 08, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 08, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 10, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 12, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: June 24, 2022NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: August 03, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: December 22, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 03, 2023MOTION - STRIKE
Date: January 09, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: July 12, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 12, 2022ORDER - DENY
Date: June 13, 2022MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: July 20, 2023DISCOVERY
Date: December 22, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 20, 2023Motion - Compel
Date: July 21, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: April 12, 2023NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: January 17, 2023Motion - Continuance
Date: April 20, 2023ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: January 17, 2023ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: April 20, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: January 10, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 10, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 02, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: July 12, 2023MOTION HEARING
Date: August 08, 2023NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: April 20, 2023MOTION - COMPEL
Date: July 10, 2023RULE 11
Date: June 22, 2023Motion - Compel
Date: October 27, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 12, 2023RESPONSE
Date: July 18, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 20, 2023MOTION - COMPEL
Date: September 29, 2023Motion - Continuance
Date: May 27, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 23, 2019ISSUE CITATION
Date: December 06, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 21, 2019ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 28, 2019ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: January 14, 2019ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: December 06, 2018DISCOVERY
Date: May 30, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 29, 2019ORDER - SETTING SCHEDULING CONF
Date: January 30, 2019NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: February 22, 2019RULE 11
Date: March 14, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 27, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 29, 2019CASE FILING COVER SHEET
Date: December 06, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 16, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 23, 2019RETURNED MAIL
Date: April 03, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: December 17, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 16, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 01, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 18, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 01, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 30, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 18, 2019MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: February 25, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 30, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 05, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 23, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 21, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 04, 2019JURY DEMAND
Date: December 06, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: March 12, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 30, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: December 17, 2018DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: October 19, 2020ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: May 27, 2020ORDER - DENY
Date: May 27, 2020NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: May 28, 2020MOTION HEARING
Date: September 16, 2021DISCOVERY
Date: May 01, 2019RULE 11
Date: February 21, 2019SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: February 22, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 03, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 27, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 27, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 25, 2020RESPONSE
Date: April 02, 2020DISCOVERY
Date: April 29, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 17, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: February 28, 2020MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: August 17, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 12, 2021MOTION - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: October 12, 2021ORDER - MISC.
Date: September 16, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 17, 2021ORDER - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: October 29, 2021OBJECTION
Date: November 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING MOTION COMPEL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Motion - Compel D/M/COMPEL, 15M, JESSICA SANCHEZ, 214-740-2534 |
|
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING MOTION COMPEL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION |
|
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION COMPEL REQUEST FO PRODUCTION MOTION - COMPEL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT MOTION HEARING MTN TO STOP SETTLEMENT * CARLA WASHINGTON * 469-321-5317 IN PERSON 30M |
|
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO ENFORCE AND COMPEL Motion - Compel 30 MIN JESSICA 214/740-2534 |
|
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT |
|
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT DENY MOTION ENFORCE SETTLEMENT & MOTION COMPEL |
|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION - MISCELLANOUS TO STOP SETTLEMENT AND NOTICE OF HEARING |
|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
REPORTERS CERTIFICATION DEPOSITION OF CARLA WASHINGTON CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION OF CARLA WASHINGTON |
|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED ORDER TO STOP SETTLEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.