Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Little, Armanda, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Maldonado, David, Wren, John Carlos, against Haas, Kenneth Mark, represented by Jones, Dianne K, Mcvay, Dianne J, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 192nd District Court with WILLIAMS, KRISTINA M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 09, 2018 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House192nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORDER - PRETRIAL
Date: January 09, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: November 11, 2019MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: October 10, 2019Jury Trial - Civil
Date: November 30, 2020ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: February 26, 2020ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: November 09, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: November 11, 2019MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: July 06, 2021MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: October 10, 2019ORDER - PRETRIAL
Date: January 09, 2019Jury Trial - Civil
Date: September 20, 2021ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: November 09, 2018ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: February 26, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 19, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 21, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 22, 2021MOTION - RETAIN
Date: October 22, 2021MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: May 18, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 18, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 06, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: November 09, 2018CHARGE OF COURT
Date: October 10, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: November 19, 2018JURY DEMAND
Date: December 10, 2018DISCOVERY
Date: January 16, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 21, 2020DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: July 06, 2021MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: February 21, 2020MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: May 19, 2021WITNESS LIST
Date: July 06, 2021ORDER - MISC.
Date: May 19, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 15, 2019PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: July 06, 2021SETTLED
Date: September 21, 2021DISCOVERY
Date: January 15, 2019ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: December 10, 2018DISCOVERY
Date: July 23, 2019EXHIBIT LIST
Date: July 06, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 02, 2019MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: July 07, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 01, 2020Final Disposition Hearing
Date: October 25, 2021ORDER - RETAIN CASE ON DOCKET
Date: October 25, 2021Final Disposition Hearing
Date: November 29, 2021NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: December 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
FP NOTICE OF ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION (2) - ALL PARTIES |
|
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | REACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
DWOP Final Disposition Hearing |
|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Hearing | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
RETAIN CASE ON DOCKET ORDER - RETAIN CASE ON DOCKET |
|
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - RETAIN CASE ON DOCKET NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED ORDER RETAIN |
|
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION RETAIN MOTION - RETAIN |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
LETTER REGARDING SETTLEMENT CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | SETTLED | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | INACTIVATE CASE (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.