Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Eubanks, Lindsey, filed a(n) Slander,Libel,Defamation - Torts case represented by Berent, Jason M, Edwards, T. Blake, Wood, Robert James, Jr, against Edwards, Antoinette H., Edwards, John C, Sightline Search, Inc, represented by Hagan, John P., Hawpe, Jeremy W., Mcallister, Greg P, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 101st District Court with WILLIAMS, STACI presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 24, 2018 |
CategoryDefamation |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeSlander,Libel,Defamation |
Filing Court House101st District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: November 12, 2018ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: October 24, 2018DISCOVERY
Date: November 05, 2018ORIGINAL ANSWER TO CROSS CLAIM - COUNTER PETITION
Date: November 16, 2018RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: November 28, 2018REQUEST FOR FINDING OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW
Date: February 07, 2019ORDER - PROTECT
Date: January 10, 2019ORDER - DENY
Date: January 14, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 18, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 24, 2019ORDER - DENY
Date: January 23, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: November 08, 2018MOTION - CONTEMPT
Date: December 13, 2018ORDER - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: May 03, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 13, 2018RESPONSE
Date: January 09, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 28, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 24, 2019MOTION - DISMISS
Date: June 27, 2019Motion - Compel
Date: June 13, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: December 18, 2018RESPONSE
Date: August 27, 2019MOTION - PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: November 28, 2018RESPONSE
Date: January 04, 2019SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS
Date: November 16, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 28, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 29, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 26, 2019AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: June 27, 2019SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS
Date: June 27, 2019ORDER - COMPEL
Date: June 14, 2019MOTION - SANCTIONS
Date: August 20, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: February 14, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 17, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 26, 2019COUNTER CLAIM
Date: October 29, 2018MOTION - EMERGENCY
Date: August 26, 2019MOTION - DISSOLVE
Date: October 01, 2019RESPONSE
Date: August 27, 2019ORDER - MISC.
Date: July 31, 2019MOTION - PROTECT
Date: December 13, 2018RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 24, 2019Special Exceptions
Date: September 26, 2019MOTION - COMPEL
Date: May 20, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 21, 2018SETTLED
Date: September 12, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 30, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 21, 2019MOTION - STRIKE
Date: July 29, 2019AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: June 10, 2019Special Exceptions
Date: July 11, 2019Motion - Sanctions
Date: August 26, 2019DISCOVERY
Date: November 09, 2018DISCOVERY
Date: September 06, 2019MOTION HEARING
Date: July 30, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 24, 2019ORDER - PROTECT
Date: January 15, 2019MOTION - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: April 17, 2019MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: February 01, 2019MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: September 10, 2019MOTION - DISMISS
Date: September 30, 2019AMENDED PETITION
Date: May 10, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: February 04, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 26, 2019OBJECTION
Date: August 19, 2019Motion - Dismiss
Date: August 01, 2019DISCOVERY
Date: November 05, 2018RESPONSE
Date: August 26, 2019DISCOVERY
Date: September 06, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 19, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 28, 2019Special Exceptions
Date: August 23, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 26, 2019ORDER - DISSOLVE
Date: October 23, 2019Motion - Dismiss
Date: October 07, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 26, 2019MOTION - DISMISS
Date: June 20, 2019RESPONSE
Date: July 29, 2019MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: July 01, 2019RESPONSE
Date: January 09, 2019DISCOVERY
Date: November 09, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 18, 2019TRUST RECEIPT
Date: October 31, 2018ORDER - PROTECT
Date: January 10, 2019MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: February 01, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: February 04, 2019REQUEST FOR FINDING OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW
Date: February 07, 2019AMENDED PETITION
Date: May 10, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 21, 2018JURY DEMAND
Date: May 10, 2019MOTION - DISMISS
Date: June 27, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: May 01, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: April 26, 2019MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: May 01, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 17, 2019Motion - Compel
Date: June 13, 2019ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: October 24, 2018CASE FILING COVER SHEET
Date: October 24, 2018CITATION ISSUED
Date: June 12, 2019AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: June 27, 2019AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: June 10, 2019ISSUE CITATION
Date: October 24, 2018MOTION - CONTEMPT
Date: December 13, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 28, 2018RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: November 28, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 14, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: November 29, 2018RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 24, 2019OBJECTION
Date: December 05, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: December 18, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 13, 2018MOTION - PROTECT
Date: December 13, 2018RESPONSE
Date: January 04, 2019ISSUE CITATION
Date: May 21, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: January 03, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 24, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 24, 2019REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: May 21, 2019ORDER - COMPEL
Date: June 14, 2019MOTION - COMPEL
Date: May 20, 2019CITATION ISSUED
Date: May 15, 2019ORDER - DENY
Date: January 23, 2019MOTION - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: April 17, 2019MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: July 01, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: July 03, 2019Motion - Sanctions
Date: August 26, 2019MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: July 02, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: July 01, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: July 03, 2019ORDER - MISC.
Date: July 31, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 30, 2019MOTION HEARING
Date: July 30, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 31, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 30, 2019ORDER - PROTECT
Date: January 15, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: February 14, 2019AMENDED CROSS-CLAIM - AMENDED COUNTER-PETITION
Date: May 21, 2019REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: June 07, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 24, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: June 05, 2019ORDER - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: May 03, 2019MOTION - DISMISS
Date: June 20, 2019OBJECTION
Date: August 19, 2019MOTION - STAY
Date: August 02, 2019OBJECTION
Date: August 19, 2019Motion - Dismiss
Date: August 01, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 02, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 16, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: July 18, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 19, 2019Special Exceptions
Date: August 23, 2019SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS
Date: June 27, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 26, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 21, 2019MOTION HEARING
Date: August 26, 2019MOTION - QUASH
Date: September 09, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 26, 2019AMENDED CROSS-CLAIM - AMENDED COUNTER-PETITION
Date: June 10, 2019MOTION - EMERGENCY
Date: August 26, 2019RESPONSE
Date: August 27, 2019RESPONSE
Date: August 26, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 28, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 28, 2019RESPONSE
Date: August 27, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 26, 2019DISCOVERY
Date: September 06, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 29, 2019DISCOVERY
Date: September 06, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: July 23, 2019MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: July 12, 2019MOTION HEARING
Date: July 24, 2019MOTION - DISMISS
Date: September 30, 2019Special Exceptions
Date: September 26, 2019SETTLED
Date: September 12, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 30, 2019MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: September 10, 2019RESPONSE
Date: July 29, 2019Special Exceptions
Date: July 11, 2019MOTION - SANCTIONS
Date: August 20, 2019OBJECTION
Date: August 21, 2019MOTION - STRIKE
Date: July 29, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 20, 2019MOTION - DISSOLVE
Date: October 01, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 30, 2019Non Jury Trial
Date: October 15, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 26, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 26, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: September 06, 2019Motion - Dismiss
Date: October 07, 2019ORDER - DISSOLVE
Date: October 23, 2019ORIGINAL ANSWER TO CROSS CLAIM - COUNTER PETITION
Date: November 16, 2018ORDER - TEMPORARY INJUNCTION
Date: October 30, 2018SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS
Date: November 16, 2018COUNTER CLAIM
Date: October 29, 2018ORDER - DENY
Date: January 14, 2019FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW
Date: March 04, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: January 11, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: November 12, 2018DISCOVERY
Date: November 05, 2018DISCOVERY
Date: November 05, 2018MOTION - PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: November 28, 2018RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: November 06, 2018RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: November 08, 2018MOTION - EMERGENCY
Date: October 29, 2018RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: November 19, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - DISSOLVE ORDER AGRD TEMP INJ |
|
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - DISSOLVE ORDER AGRD TEMP INJ |
|
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS COPY ALL |
|
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event | REACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS COPY ALL |
|
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event | REACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference | |
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference | |
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
101st Jury Trial Notice 1 Non Jury Trial |
|
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Non Jury Trial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.