Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Taylor, Beverly, Taylor, Freddie, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Crozier, Michael A, Johnson, Lalah Lynne, Veerasaeng, Sy S, against Chuy Roofing, Gutierrez, Jesus, Peaceful Hope Baptist Church, represented by Huffstutler, Michael W., Winslett, Greg K, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 134th District Court with TILLERY, DALE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 24, 2018 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House134th District Court |
This complaint is a Plaintiffs' Original Petition and Rule 194 Request for Disclosures filed by Freddie Taylor and Beverly Taylor against Peaceful Hope Baptist Church, Chuy Roofing, Jesus Gutierrez d/b/a Chuy Roofing, and Jesus Gutierrez. The plainti...
NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: March 06, 2019ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 23, 2019ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: October 08, 2019MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: October 07, 2019SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: March 06, 2019ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: August 24, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 07, 2019NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: October 08, 2019DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: February 15, 2019NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: May 22, 2020Non Jury Trial
Date: June 29, 2020NOTE - CLERKS
Date: March 08, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 29, 2020NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: August 31, 2021NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: May 06, 2021MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: February 21, 2022MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: April 27, 2021NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: September 30, 2020SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: May 06, 2021NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: February 25, 2022NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: September 30, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: December 14, 2022Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: August 25, 2023Motion - Reconsider
Date: November 14, 2023MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: July 13, 2023NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: July 17, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: June 20, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: September 24, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 10, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: March 13, 2023NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: October 08, 2019AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: April 21, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 15, 2022NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: February 25, 2022NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: May 22, 2020MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: August 30, 2021RESPONSE
Date: August 18, 2023ORDER - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: May 16, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: September 07, 2018MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: June 14, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 24, 2020ORDER - DENY
Date: December 04, 2023NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: March 06, 2019MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: October 07, 2019NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: September 09, 2020Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: July 10, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 07, 2019MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: January 04, 2023ORDER - PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: August 29, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 25, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 21, 2023AMENDED PETITION
Date: August 27, 2018ORDER - NONSUIT
Date: March 08, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 06, 2022MOTION - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: May 12, 2021NOTICE OF NONSUIT
Date: March 03, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 30, 2021SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: February 25, 2022SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: August 31, 2021NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: July 21, 2022NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: October 08, 2019SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: September 30, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 12, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 30, 2024NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 04, 2023MOTION - RECONSIDER
Date: September 28, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: September 29, 2020MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: August 14, 2020NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: May 22, 2020SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: March 06, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2019SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: May 18, 2023NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: November 28, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 13, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 17, 2023SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: January 08, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 10, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: May 10, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: July 21, 2023NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: January 09, 2023RESPONSE
Date: August 23, 2023RESPONSE
Date: October 17, 2023DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: February 15, 2019ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: October 08, 2019ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: August 24, 2018MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: December 05, 2023NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: September 29, 2020NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: July 17, 2020SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: July 20, 2022NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: March 06, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2019NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: January 08, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 24, 2018RESPONSE
Date: November 14, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 03, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: November 01, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 26, 2023RESPONSE
Date: July 03, 2023ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 23, 2019MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: January 30, 2024Jury Trial - Civil
Date: February 05, 2024ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: September 29, 2020MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: July 15, 2022MOTION - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: August 20, 2021NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: September 29, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: November 14, 2023NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: May 23, 2023MOTION - COMPEL
Date: March 21, 2023CASE FILING COVER SHEET
Date: August 24, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 18, 2023NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: August 29, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 20, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 21, 2022RETURNED MAIL
Date: June 05, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 27, 2021Motion - Compel
Date: May 04, 2023ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 20, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2019DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: September 26, 2019SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS
Date: April 21, 2023REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: September 06, 2018Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: August 04, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 26, 2023RESPONSE
Date: November 14, 2023Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: August 25, 2023Motion - Reconsider
Date: November 14, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
134th Trial Notice Letters Jury Trial - Civil |
|
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER AGREED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
AGREED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE MOTION - CONTINUANCE AGREED |
|
December 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
~ESERVE COVER LETTER MISCELLANOUS EVENT ESERVE COVER LETTER - ORDER MISC. |
|
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER DENYING MTN FOR REHEARING ORDER - DENY - REHEARING AND RECONSIDERATION |
|
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MTN FOR REHEARING Motion - Reconsider 45 MINS - M/RECONSIDER - LALAH 972 850 0500 X 332 (hearing held, ruling issued) |
|
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLTS RESP TO DEFS LETTER TO JUDGE TILLERY RESPONSE |
|
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFS LETTER TO COURT CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE |
|
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED ORDER FOR REHEARING |
|
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLTS REPLY TO DEFS OPPOSITION TO REHEARING RESPONSE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.