Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Jackson, A.B., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Kohm, David S, against Hooker, Lameesha, represented by Castillo, Edward E., Reily, Read H, Rosales, George, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 44th District Court with FRAZIER, VERETTA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 20, 2018 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House44th District Court |
MOTION HEARING
Date: October 17, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 08, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 06, 2018MOTION - RETAIN
Date: October 11, 2018MOTION - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: October 11, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 11, 2018MOTION - RETAIN
Date: December 06, 2018ORDER - SETTING SCHEDULING CONF
Date: January 06, 2019SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: January 18, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: January 17, 2019MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: November 30, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 30, 2021MOTION HEARING
Date: October 17, 2018ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: August 20, 2018CASE FILING COVER SHEET
Date: August 20, 2018DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: June 10, 2021NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: January 04, 2021NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: June 29, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: August 20, 2018NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING
Date: September 19, 2018JURY DEMAND
Date: December 26, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 10, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 10, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: December 11, 2018CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: January 17, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 10, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 08, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 10, 2019DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: February 21, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: July 23, 2021EXHIBIT LIST
Date: November 30, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 10, 2019ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: November 13, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 17, 2019MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: November 08, 2019ORDER - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: December 06, 2018NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: November 20, 2019NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: February 24, 2020CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: February 19, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 09, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 10, 2019NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: January 18, 2019NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: September 18, 2020NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: June 29, 2020PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: November 30, 2021WITNESS LIST
Date: November 30, 2021NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT
Date: December 17, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 11, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
DESIGNATION OF LEAD COUNSEL DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL |
|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | INACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
TRIAL SETTING (JURY) ONE DAY, PER P, CASE HAS MEDIATED |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Jury Trial - Civil | |
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION - IN LIMINE |
|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON LIMINE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT LIST EXHIBIT LIST PLAINTIFF'S |
|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | PROPOSED JURY CHARGE | |
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS LIST WITNESS LIST PLAINTIFF'S |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.