Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Smith-Clay, Lynette, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Hunnicutt, James E., Scott, Mary L, Spencer, Jennifer J, against Dallas County, Texas, represented by Cowman, Jordan W, Waite, Frank, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 68th District Court with HOFFMAN, MARTIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 20, 2018 |
CategoryEmployment |
Last RefreshedOctober 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court House68th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
MOTION - DISMISS
Date: December 13, 2018MOTION - DISMISS
Date: December 13, 2018ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: August 20, 2018WAIVER
Date: September 06, 2018ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: October 01, 2018AMENDED PETITION
Date: November 21, 2018ISSUE CITATION
Date: August 20, 2018AMENDED PETITION
Date: November 15, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 17, 2018RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 13, 2018ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: September 17, 2018NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: November 20, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR FWD SIGNED DISML ORDER TO CLERKS |
|
December 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR FWD DISML ORDER TO JUDGE FOR REV |
|
December 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR FWD SIGNED DISML ORDER TO CLERKS |
|
December 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR FWD DISML ORDER TO JUDGE FOR REV |
|
December 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
2018 1213 Agreed Order of Dismissal NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
December 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
2018 1213 Agreed Order of Dismissal NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
2018 1213 Agreed Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice MOTION - DISMISS AGREED |
|
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
2018 1213 Agreed Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice MOTION - DISMISS AGREED |
|
November 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
2ND AP AMENDED PETITION 2ND |
|
November 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
AMENDED PETITION 2ND |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.