Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Clearwater Properties, Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Martin, J Edwin, against Dodson, Baron A., Ishino, Glenn, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 95th District Court with MOLBERG, KEN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 19, 2018 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House95th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 19, 2018MOTION - DISMISS
Date: August 15, 2018ORDER - DISMISSAL
Date: August 20, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 15, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED | |
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR to clerk: Order of Non-Suit - copy mailed to counsel. |
|
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION | |
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR Dismissal hearing canceled. Non-Suit filed. |
|
September 19, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NONSUIT | |
August 30, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED | |
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER - DISMISSAL AGAINST GLENN ISHINO |
|
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR to clerk: Order - signed 8/20/2018. |
|
August 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
agreedmotion2dismissishino MOTION - DISMISS |
|
August 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
agreedorderdismissishino NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT ORDER TO DISMISS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.