Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Steelman, Ron, filed a(n) Property case represented by Branson, Frank L, Burkhead, John Tindall, against Fairmont Management Company, Inc., Gundle Holdings, Inc, represented by Bezney, Paul A., Fletcher, Douglas D, Schwartz, Amanda L, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 95th District Court with PURDY, MONICA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 04, 2018 |
CategoryProperty |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House95th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: June 14, 2018SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: July 17, 2018ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: June 29, 2018ORDER - DISMISSAL
Date: May 29, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 22, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: November 06, 2019MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: February 04, 2020MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: February 19, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: July 31, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 22, 2019MOTION - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: July 31, 2018MOTION - PROTECT
Date: February 11, 2020ORDER - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: August 02, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 29, 2019RESPONSE
Date: April 15, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 19, 2020AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: February 17, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 04, 2020MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: March 02, 2020MOTION - STRIKE
Date: February 25, 2020AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: July 31, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 27, 2020Motion - Continuance
Date: February 14, 2020MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: February 21, 2020MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: August 29, 2019ORDER - STRIKE
Date: February 28, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 11, 2020Motion - Protect
Date: February 20, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 20, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 25, 2020Motion - Strike
Date: February 28, 2020MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: February 28, 2020ORDER - PROTECT
Date: February 20, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 17, 2020OBJECTION
Date: March 04, 2020RESPONSE
Date: March 03, 2020Motion - Continuance
Date: February 28, 2020Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: April 01, 2020MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: March 03, 2020OBJECTION
Date: February 28, 2020MOTION - BIFURCATE
Date: March 04, 2020Motion - Compel
Date: March 19, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: March 05, 2020MOTION - STRIKE
Date: March 19, 2020RESPONSE
Date: March 17, 2020MOTION - STRIKE
Date: March 04, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 18, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 04, 2020Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: April 23, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: March 23, 2020Motion - Compel
Date: April 16, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: March 04, 2020RESPONSE
Date: March 25, 2020Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: April 29, 2020MOTION - COMPEL
Date: March 09, 2020MOTION - SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: May 27, 2020Motion - Compel
Date: April 23, 2020Motion - Compel
Date: May 21, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: June 13, 2018ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: June 14, 2018ISSUE CITATION
Date: October 17, 2018AMENDED PETITION
Date: October 16, 2018JURY DEMAND
Date: July 25, 2018RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: October 26, 2018ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: November 09, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 22, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: July 31, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 26, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 05, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 07, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 30, 2018ORDER - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: August 02, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 20, 2018RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: June 13, 2018RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: June 13, 2018CASE FILING COVER SHEET
Date: June 05, 2018SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: July 17, 2018ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: June 29, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 17, 2019ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: June 04, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 31, 2019CITATION ISSUED
Date: June 06, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 04, 2018AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: July 31, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: July 17, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 08, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: February 12, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 20, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 25, 2019TRIAL SETTING (JURY)
Date: August 19, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 16, 2019MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: June 06, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 25, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 30, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: June 08, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 07, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 09, 2018MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: August 29, 2019MOTION - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: July 31, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: March 04, 2020TRIAL SETTING (JURY)
Date: March 04, 2020Motion - Compel
Date: April 16, 2020MOTION - STRIKE
Date: March 19, 2020Motion - Compel
Date: March 19, 2020TRIAL SETTING (JURY)
Date: March 23, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: March 26, 2020RESPONSE
Date: March 25, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 07, 2020RESPONSE
Date: April 15, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 24, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 09, 2020TRIAL SETTING (JURY)
Date: April 23, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 26, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 17, 2020Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: April 23, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 18, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: May 01, 2020Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: April 29, 2020Motion - Compel
Date: May 21, 2020SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: June 10, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: June 10, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: June 12, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 01, 2020MOTION HEARING
Date: July 02, 2020MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: June 29, 2020MOTION - SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: May 27, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 29, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 05, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: June 12, 2020Motion - Compel
Date: April 23, 2020Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: July 07, 2020Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: July 17, 2020MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: May 02, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 17, 2020MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: July 29, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 15, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 27, 2020TRIAL SETTING (JURY)
Date: January 09, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 04, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 02, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 07, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 15, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: October 01, 2020ORDER - JUDGMENT
Date: July 29, 2020MOTION - QUASH
Date: August 20, 2020ORDER - DENY
Date: February 24, 2021NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED
Date: July 31, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 02, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 17, 2020CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE
Date: January 29, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 10, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 24, 2021MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: September 24, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: October 28, 2021TRIAL SETTING (JURY)
Date: April 23, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: February 01, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: November 03, 2021ORDER - MISC.
Date: December 07, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 09, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 22, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 17, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: June 08, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: June 11, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 16, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 26, 2021AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: July 14, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 05, 2021MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: January 22, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 16, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 29, 2021DISCOVERY
Date: April 28, 2021MOTION - SHORTEN/LENGTHEN TIME
Date: August 21, 2023TRIAL SETTING (JURY)
Date: June 21, 2021RESPONSE
Date: June 18, 2021MOTION HEARING
Date: February 10, 2021REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: December 08, 2021DISCOVERY
Date: April 29, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: April 18, 2022WITNESS LIST
Date: December 21, 2021Motion - Compel
Date: September 30, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: June 10, 2022ISSUE LETTERS ROGATORY
Date: December 08, 2021BRIEF FILED
Date: August 01, 2022MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: December 21, 2021BRIEF FILED
Date: August 24, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: August 15, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: August 17, 2023DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 12, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 16, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 17, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: August 21, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 17, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: December 15, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 18, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: August 21, 2023Special Setting
Date: August 21, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: December 21, 2021DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 14, 2023OBJECTION
Date: August 14, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: August 14, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: June 10, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 15, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: April 08, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 19, 2021CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE
Date: August 17, 2021PRE-TRIAL HEARING
Date: August 21, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: August 17, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: August 21, 2023CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE
Date: September 30, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 20, 2021DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 10, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 05, 2022DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 23, 2023RESPONSE
Date: August 21, 2023ORDER - LIMINE
Date: August 21, 2023STRIKE SHEET
Date: August 23, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: August 24, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: August 14, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: August 21, 2023ORDER - LIMINE
Date: August 21, 2023CHARGE OF COURT
Date: August 29, 2023MOTION - COMPEL
Date: August 03, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 21, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 21, 2021EXHIBIT LIST
Date: October 21, 2022CHARGE OF COURT
Date: December 21, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 13, 2022BRIEF FILED
Date: August 24, 2023PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: August 28, 2023PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: August 28, 2023MOTION - JUDGMENT
Date: September 05, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: August 29, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 05, 2023BRIEF FILED
Date: August 29, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: September 18, 2023Final Disposition Hearing
Date: October 13, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: September 12, 2023RESPONSE
Date: February 02, 2023MOTION HEARING
Date: September 20, 2023FINAL DISPOSITION HEARING
Date: September 05, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: August 21, 2023STRIKE SHEET
Date: August 22, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: September 08, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 22, 2019Motion - Continuance
Date: August 30, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 29, 2019MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: August 30, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: February 25, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 30, 2018Motion - Continuance
Date: February 14, 2020AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: February 17, 2020MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: February 04, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 04, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 20, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 07, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: February 05, 2020MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: February 25, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 02, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 07, 2018ORDER - STRIKE
Date: February 28, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: February 25, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 20, 2020MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: February 19, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 22, 2019Motion - Protect
Date: February 20, 2020MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: February 21, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 19, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 02, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 22, 2019NOTICE OF NONSUIT
Date: May 22, 2019ORDER - PROTECT
Date: February 20, 2020MOTION - STRIKE
Date: February 25, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 25, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 21, 2020DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 28, 2020EXHIBIT LIST
Date: February 28, 2020MOTION - STRIKE
Date: March 04, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: March 05, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: March 04, 2020RESPONSE
Date: March 03, 2020ORDER - DISMISSAL
Date: May 29, 2019OBJECTION
Date: March 04, 2020Motion - Continuance
Date: February 28, 2020PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: March 03, 2020DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 28, 2020MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: February 28, 2020PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: February 28, 2020Motion - Strike
Date: February 28, 2020MOTION - COMPEL
Date: March 09, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 21, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 06, 2019RULE 11
Date: December 20, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 11, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 11, 2020TRIAL SETTING (JURY)
Date: January 07, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: November 06, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 04, 2019MOTION - PROTECT
Date: February 11, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 04, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 27, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 25, 2020MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: March 02, 2020DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 02, 2020WITNESS LIST
Date: March 03, 2020EXHIBIT LIST
Date: March 03, 2020PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: March 02, 2020MOTION - BIFURCATE
Date: March 04, 2020OBJECTION
Date: March 04, 2020EXHIBIT LIST
Date: March 02, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 04, 2020PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: March 04, 2020OBJECTION
Date: March 04, 2020EXHIBIT LIST
Date: March 02, 2020WITNESS LIST
Date: February 28, 2020RESPONSE
Date: March 17, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: March 10, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 18, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 17, 2020WITNESS LIST
Date: March 02, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: March 23, 2020OBJECTION
Date: February 28, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 01, 2020Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: April 01, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 14, 2020MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: March 03, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
FINAL HEARING NOTICE-MP Final Disposition Hearing |
|
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEF'S MOTION TO ENTER JUDGMENT ON THE VERDICT MOTION HEARING SET BY AMBER HARRISON #214-987-9600, IN PERSON, CC REQ |
|
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
E-SERVE COVER LETTER MISCELLANOUS EVENT ESERVE COVER LETTER - ESERVE JUDGMENT ON THE VERDICT |
|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event | REACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEF'S MOTION TO ENTER JUDGMENT ON THE VERDICT NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT AMENDED, ON DEF'S MOTION TO ENTER JUDGMENT ON THE VERDICT |
|
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS CC REC'D FOR 9/13 2:30PM HEARING ON PROPOSED JUDGMENT |
|
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ENTER JUDGMENT ON THE VERDICT NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ENTER JUDGMENT ON THE VERDICT |
|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO ENTER JUDGMENT ON THE VERDICT MOTION - JUDGMENT TO ENTER JUDGMENT ON THE VERDICT |
|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED JUDGMENT ON THE VERDICT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION HEARING NOTICE FINAL DISPOSITION HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.