Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Harvey, Tina, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Reilley, Timothy R, against Muhammad, Laschwanna, represented by Meyer, Sara Bonau, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 116th District Court with PARKER, TONYA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePARKER, TONYA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2017 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House116th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: March 27, 2018MOTION - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: February 22, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 22, 2018DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: April 24, 2018ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: March 21, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 08, 2019SETTLED
Date: January 14, 2019SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: April 23, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 10, 2018RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: March 05, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: March 21, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 10, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 10, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 10, 2018ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: December 28, 2017AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 10, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: April 10, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 10, 2018CASE FILING COVER SHEET
Date: December 28, 2017CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: March 20, 2018CITATION ISSUED
Date: January 03, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 10, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 07, 2019Final Disposition Hearing
Date: February 12, 2019NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS
Date: January 02, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 10, 2018ORDER - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: February 23, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 10, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
116 DISPO Final Disposition Hearing |
|
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event | REACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
February 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
P-Order - Dismissal Agreed - Signed NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
3164705 Harvey.Tina L. Volume I 121718.ER CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION Tina L. Harvey |
|
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
JUDGE LETTER - SETTLED SETTLED |
|
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event | INACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial - Civil Initial Trial Setting (Level 2) |
|
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
DC-17-17686 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS Timothy R. Reilley |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | VACATION LETTER | |
May 08, 2018 | Docket Event | VACATION LETTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.