Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Act Pipe & Supply, Inc., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Thompson, Carl W, against Capital Trade Groups, Llc, Mm Finished Lots, Llc, Oulad-Chikh, Mustapha, represented by Mcmurray, Thomas Monroe, Prisock, Kerry L, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 44th District Court with GOLDSTEIN, BONNIE LEE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGOLDSTEIN, BONNIE LEE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2017 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House44th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: December 27, 2017AMENDED PETITION
Date: September 18, 2018ISSUE CITATION
Date: December 27, 2017CASE FILING COVER SHEET
Date: December 27, 2017CITATION ISSUED
Date: January 02, 2018RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: December 07, 2018NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: November 20, 2018RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: December 07, 2018JURY DEMAND
Date: November 19, 2018ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: January 22, 2019CROSS CLAIM
Date: November 21, 2018ISSUE CITATION
Date: November 21, 2018AMENDED CROSS-CLAIM - AMENDED COUNTER-PETITION
Date: January 22, 2019ISSUE CITATION
Date: January 22, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 30, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 30, 2019ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: March 04, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 11, 2019NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: April 14, 2019Jury Trial - Civil
Date: November 04, 2019EXHIBIT LIST
Date: November 07, 2019RULE 166
Date: November 07, 2019PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: November 08, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 11, 2019ORDER - JUDGMENT
Date: November 11, 2019MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: November 08, 2019SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: April 12, 2019ORDER - SETTING SCHEDULING CONF
Date: March 21, 2019ORIGINAL ANSWER TO CROSS CLAIM - COUNTER PETITION
Date: March 21, 2019REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: January 22, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 17, 2019ORDER - PARTIAL DISMISSAL
Date: January 17, 2019MOTION - DISMISS
Date: January 17, 2019REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: November 21, 2018SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: February 15, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 15, 2018ORDER - SETTING SCHEDULING CONF
Date: January 23, 2018ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 19, 2018REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: December 27, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
NON SIGNED PROPSOED ORD-O/AGRD JDGT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT Agreed Judgment |
|
November 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - JUDGMENT AGRD FINAL-AS TO CROSS PLTFS-MM FINISHED LOTS & CROSS-DEFTS-CAPITAL TRADE GROUPS, LLC & MUSTAPHA OULAD-CHIKH |
|
November 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED DEFT'S ATTYS ALONG W/COPIES OF THE O/AGRD FINAL JDGT |
|
November 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial - Civil HELD OVER FROM 11/4/19 |
|
November 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED JURY CHARGE DEFT |
|
November 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
DEFT-MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION - IN LIMINE |
|
November 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
DEFT-MM FINISHED LOTS, LLC-EXHIBIT LIST EXHIBIT LIST DEFT |
|
November 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
DEFT-MM FINISHED LOTS, LLC-RULE 166 RULE 166 DEFT-MM FINISHED LOTS LLC |
|
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TRIAL Jury Trial - Civil |
|
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
TRIAL SETTING (JURY) P IS OUT OF CASE, JUST CROSS CLAIMS LEFT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.