Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Polk, Vickie, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by King, Justin H, Lopez, Jose Padilla, Iv, against Sanders, Demarkus, represented by Bhalla, Kavita K, Jenkins, Young C., in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 162nd District Court with MOORE, MARICELA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMOORE, MARICELA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2017 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House162nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORDER - REINSTATE (OCA and REOPEN CASE)
Date: June 25, 2018SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: September 04, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 12, 2018MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: September 18, 2019DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: November 28, 2018EXPERT WITNESS LIST
Date: September 18, 2019AMENDED PETITION
Date: July 10, 2019MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: September 17, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 17, 2019ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: May 09, 2019ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: September 20, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 22, 2018DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: September 28, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 03, 2019DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: July 29, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: December 03, 2018DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: September 12, 2019MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: June 22, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 21, 2020MOTION - REINSTATE
Date: June 12, 2018EXPERT WITNESS LIST
Date: December 12, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS COPY MAILED TO: PLAINTIFF/DEFENDANT |
|
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR O/NONSUIT TO JUDGE |
|
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event | REACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF NON-SUIT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF NON-SUIT WITH PREJUDICE NOTICE OF NONSUIT |
|
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
VICKIE POLK CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION REPORTERS CERTIFICATE - VICKIE POLK |
|
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
162nd Jury Trial Reset Letter Jury Trial - Civil |
|
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event | SETTLED | |
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event | INACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
DISCOVERY STATE FARM COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF TEXAS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.