Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Downie-Fraser, Nicole E., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Dean, Cameron E, Hancock, Joshua, Jones, Ian T., against Sainz, Valeria, represented by Bhalla, Kavita K, Jenkins, Young C., in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 95th District Court with PURDY, MONICA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 17, 2017 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House95th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 17, 2017MOTION - STRIKE
Date: May 03, 2018DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: April 26, 2018Motion - Strike
Date: June 06, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 04, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 03, 2018ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: August 17, 2017CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: November 15, 2017CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: May 03, 2018MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: April 19, 2019SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: October 26, 2017AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 27, 2017NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR
Date: August 24, 2017RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 29, 2017CITATION ISSUED
Date: August 18, 2017CASE FILING COVER SHEET
Date: August 17, 2017CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 17, 2017AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 27, 2017AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 27, 2017AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 27, 2017CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: March 02, 2018MOTION - STRIKE
Date: May 03, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: May 09, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 03, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: July 11, 2018DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: October 19, 2017AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 27, 2017TRIAL SETTING (JURY)
Date: October 26, 2017CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 11, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 07, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: March 22, 2022Final Disposition Hearing
Date: April 07, 2022NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED
Date: April 05, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 22, 2018Motion - Strike
Date: June 06, 2018TRIAL SETTING (JURY)
Date: July 10, 2018MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: July 08, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: September 14, 2017EXHIBIT LIST
Date: December 06, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 08, 2021PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: July 08, 2021WITNESS LIST
Date: July 08, 2021PRE-TRIAL HEARING
Date: July 09, 2021TRIAL SETTING (JURY)
Date: February 25, 2021TRIAL SETTING (JURY)
Date: July 14, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 27, 2017AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 27, 2017CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 27, 2017JURY DEMAND
Date: September 14, 2017DISCOVERY
Date: March 02, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 27, 2017AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 27, 2017ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: August 17, 2017CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: May 03, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: November 15, 2017MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: January 04, 2019WITNESS LIST
Date: September 07, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 13, 2018PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: September 07, 2018TRIAL SETTING (JURY)
Date: May 14, 2021NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: October 12, 2018EXHIBIT LIST
Date: April 19, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 10, 2017CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: March 08, 2022TRIAL SETTING (JURY)
Date: August 19, 2021CHARGE OF COURT
Date: March 09, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 04, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: February 23, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: December 06, 2019MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: March 08, 2022RULE 11
Date: March 04, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: February 28, 2022ORDER - LIMINE
Date: March 09, 2022STRIKE SHEET
Date: March 09, 2022STRIKE SHEET
Date: March 09, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: March 08, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event | TRUST RECEIPT | |
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Hearing | |
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
FP NOTICE OF AGREED JUDGMENT RULE 306(a)(3)-YOUNG JENKINS NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE REGARDING AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT |
|
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR Case tried 3/9/2022. Set for Final Hearing. E-mailed counsel. |
|
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | CHARGE OF COURT | |
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S ORDER - LIMINE ORDER - LIMINE PLAINTIFF'S |
|
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
STRIKE SHEET PLTF |
|
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
STRIKE SHEET DEF |
|
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT'S 1ST AMENDED ORDER - LIMINE ORDER - LIMINE DEFENDANT'S 1ST AMENDED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.