Case Last Refreshed: 2 hours ago
Hayes, Keldrick, Hayes, Yolanda Renee, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Nowak, Matthew, against Walnut Hill Physicians Hospital Llc, represented by Fraley, Elizabeth M, Huber, Courtney Boes, Kanny, Heather A, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 192nd District Court with ACEVES, MARIA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 05, 2017 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice |
Last RefreshedMay 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court House192nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
MOTION - EXCLUDE
Date: January 07, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 10, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 07, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 19, 2019MOTION HEARING
Date: June 24, 2019RESPONSE
Date: June 20, 2019MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: January 17, 2020Jury Trial - Civil
Date: January 14, 2019MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: December 31, 2019AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 14, 2020AMENDED PETITION
Date: October 26, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: October 23, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 12, 2019MOTION HEARING
Date: January 15, 2020OBJECTION
Date: December 13, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 12, 2019RESPONSE
Date: October 04, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 22, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 15, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 15, 2018JURY DEMAND
Date: April 02, 2018WITNESS LIST
Date: January 17, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 10, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 04, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 02, 2018DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: September 18, 2017CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 14, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 10, 2020RESPONSE
Date: October 30, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 06, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: October 24, 2017RULE 166
Date: January 17, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 27, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: December 31, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 31, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 04, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 14, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 26, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 04, 2019AMENDED PETITION
Date: December 27, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: January 08, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 27, 2019OBJECTION
Date: November 20, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 27, 2019OBJECTION
Date: December 04, 2019MOTION - QUASH
Date: December 03, 2019OBJECTION
Date: January 24, 2020DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 17, 2020EXHIBIT LIST
Date: January 17, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 10, 2020OBJECTION
Date: January 24, 2020EXHIBIT LIST
Date: January 17, 2020OBJECTION
Date: December 17, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 27, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: January 13, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 03, 2019MOTION - QUASH
Date: December 02, 2019OBJECTION
Date: January 24, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: September 05, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 10, 2020CHARGE OF COURT
Date: January 17, 2020MOTION - BIFURCATE
Date: January 13, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: January 10, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 12, 2019OBJECTION
Date: December 18, 2019OBJECTION
Date: July 16, 2019RESPONSE
Date: October 29, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 06, 2019MOTION - EMERGENCY
Date: October 19, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: April 05, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 06, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 09, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 15, 2018OBJECTION
Date: June 08, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 17, 2020AMENDED PETITION
Date: September 10, 2018MOTION - EMERGENCY
Date: January 10, 2020AMENDED PETITION
Date: June 12, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: June 13, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: January 13, 2020ORDER - PRETRIAL
Date: April 02, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 27, 2019RULE 11
Date: April 13, 2018MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: June 12, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 13, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 10, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 10, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 13, 2018MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: January 17, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 09, 2018AMENDED PETITION
Date: June 11, 2018RESPONSE
Date: March 28, 2018MOTION - ENTER ORDER
Date: March 07, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 28, 2018ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: October 27, 2017CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 25, 2017REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: June 12, 2017RESPONSE
Date: March 23, 2020RESPONSE
Date: March 25, 2020RESPONSE
Date: March 23, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 06, 2020RESPONSE
Date: March 23, 2020RESPONSE
Date: March 25, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 13, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: February 28, 2020DISCOVERY
Date: January 27, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 09, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 10, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 10, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: January 10, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 05, 2018MOTION - PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: January 07, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: March 09, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 21, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 07, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 20, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: March 22, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 27, 2019MOTION - COMPEL
Date: August 30, 2019ISSUE CITATION
Date: June 12, 2017CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 26, 2018PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: January 17, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 17, 2020Motion - Compel
Date: October 07, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: December 27, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 27, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 07, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 05, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 31, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 06, 2018RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 20, 2019ORDER - PROTECT
Date: November 07, 2018OBJECTION
Date: November 20, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 29, 2019SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: June 28, 2019ORDER - COMPEL
Date: October 07, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 17, 2020DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: April 22, 2019SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: July 26, 2018OBJECTION
Date: December 23, 2019MOTION - ENTER ORDER
Date: May 15, 2019OBJECTION
Date: December 12, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 18, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: May 23, 2019WITNESS LIST
Date: January 17, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 26, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 03, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: October 22, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 23, 2018CASE FILING COVER SHEET
Date: June 05, 2017MOTION - QUASH
Date: March 22, 2018MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: April 02, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 05, 2018ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: June 05, 2017CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 14, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 03, 2019MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: July 13, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 14, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 06, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: June 27, 2018RESPONSE
Date: October 22, 2018RULE 11
Date: October 19, 2018RESPONSE
Date: January 13, 2020DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 17, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 27, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 28, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 13, 2020DISCOVERY
Date: February 21, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: March 04, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 21, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: February 28, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 04, 2020OBJECTION
Date: January 24, 2020RESPONSE
Date: March 23, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 27, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: February 07, 2020PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: April 07, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 16, 2023MOTION HEARING
Date: June 08, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: April 07, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: April 07, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 06, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: May 10, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 28, 2023Final Disposition Hearing
Date: June 02, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 11, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 13, 2023JURY NOTE
Date: April 10, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: February 07, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: February 24, 2023RESPONSE
Date: June 06, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 10, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: March 27, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: December 22, 2022MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: May 10, 2023CHARGE OF COURT
Date: April 10, 2023ORDER - RETAIN CASE ON DOCKET
Date: May 18, 2023MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: May 11, 2023Final Disposition Hearing
Date: August 18, 2023Final Disposition Hearing
Date: July 07, 2023PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: April 07, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: April 10, 2023STRIKE SHEET
Date: March 28, 2023OBJECTION
Date: March 27, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: March 21, 2023BRIEF FILED
Date: February 06, 2023BRIEF FILED
Date: February 06, 2023RESPONSE
Date: March 25, 2020EXHIBIT LIST
Date: January 31, 2023ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: February 13, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: February 13, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: March 27, 2023MOTION - QUASH
Date: March 24, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: March 27, 2023ORDER - COMPEL
Date: December 22, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 22, 20225TH COA ORDER
Date: February 08, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: February 08, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: February 22, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: March 27, 2023STRIKE SHEET
Date: March 29, 2023COA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER
Date: February 08, 2023MOTION - QUASH
Date: February 06, 2023COA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER
Date: February 16, 2023BRIEF FILED
Date: March 27, 2023DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 24, 2023STRIKE SHEET
Date: March 29, 20235TH COA ORDER
Date: February 16, 2023OBJECTION
Date: February 03, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: February 06, 2023OPINION
Date: February 16, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: February 03, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 11, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: March 21, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 06, 2023STRIKE SHEET
Date: March 28, 2023DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 02, 2023RESPONSE
Date: June 24, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 22, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: February 06, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 04, 2021OBJECTION
Date: February 06, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 15, 2021Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: May 14, 2020Motion - Strike
Date: June 25, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: June 22, 2021EXHIBIT LIST
Date: February 03, 2023OBJECTION
Date: January 30, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 03, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 08, 2021RESPONSE
Date: February 06, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 05, 2021OBJECTION
Date: February 06, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 19, 2021DISCOVERY
Date: April 07, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: February 02, 2021OBJECTION
Date: February 06, 2023MOTION - EMERGENCY
Date: June 21, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 19, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: December 28, 2022OBJECTION
Date: February 03, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 27, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: June 15, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: June 17, 2021Motion - Compel
Date: July 15, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 09, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 01, 2020Motion - Strike
Date: June 25, 2021Jury Trial - Civil
Date: August 16, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 07, 2021RESPONSE
Date: March 26, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 30, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 30, 2020Motion - Strike
Date: June 29, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 30, 2020MOTION - PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: June 11, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 12, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 04, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 15, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 03, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: December 14, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 12, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 13, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 05, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS
Date: March 31, 2020DISCOVERY
Date: March 19, 2021ORDER - RETAIN CASE ON DOCKET
Date: July 07, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: May 29, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 15, 2020MOTION - COMPEL
Date: December 16, 2022ORDER - DENY
Date: June 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 16, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 14, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: December 20, 2022ORDER - MISC.
Date: October 20, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 14, 2022CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE
Date: December 19, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: February 28, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 14, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 14, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: December 14, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 30, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 30, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: December 30, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 20, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 13, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 14, 2022RESPONSE
Date: June 24, 2021DISCOVERY
Date: June 23, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 24, 2021BRIEF FILED
Date: August 12, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 30, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 06, 2022COA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER
Date: April 25, 2022MOTION HEARING
Date: May 26, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 30, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 24, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 30, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: March 30, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 30, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 30, 2020OBJECTION
Date: March 26, 2020Status Conference
Date: December 22, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 23, 2022EXHIBIT LIST
Date: January 30, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 14, 2022PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: February 03, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: December 22, 2022WITNESS LIST
Date: January 30, 2023MOTION - QUASH
Date: January 30, 2023ORDER - LIMINE
Date: December 22, 2022DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 10, 2023MOTION - RETAIN
Date: July 06, 2023ORDER - DENY
Date: December 22, 2022ORDER - LIMINE
Date: December 22, 2022ORDER - DENY
Date: December 22, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 21, 2021RULE 11
Date: July 06, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 24, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 03, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 23, 2023RESPONSE
Date: June 01, 2023MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: August 09, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 04, 2022ORDER - DENY
Date: June 10, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 29, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 15, 2020MOTION - DISMISS
Date: July 28, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 06, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 23, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: April 27, 2022RESPONSE
Date: May 24, 2022RESPONSE
Date: August 12, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 19, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 12, 2021PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: August 09, 2021DISCOVERY
Date: August 23, 2021BRIEF FILED
Date: August 12, 2021BRIEF FILED
Date: August 09, 2021ORDER - DENY
Date: July 15, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 16, 2021Motion - Compel
Date: October 13, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: July 16, 2021COA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER
Date: April 27, 2022ORDER - STAY
Date: June 27, 2022OPINION
Date: April 25, 2022MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: April 27, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 13, 2021MOTION - LEAVE
Date: July 13, 2021COA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER
Date: April 27, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 13, 2022DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 12, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 13, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 19, 2021RESPONSE
Date: August 11, 2021ORDER - DENY
Date: August 15, 2021BRIEF FILED
Date: August 09, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 15, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 11, 2021WITNESS LIST
Date: August 09, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 11, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 17, 2021EXHIBIT LIST
Date: August 10, 2021EXHIBIT LIST
Date: August 09, 2021BRIEF FILED
Date: August 11, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 24, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 15, 2021EXHIBIT LIST
Date: August 11, 2021ORDER - ABATE
Date: August 15, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 13, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: June 25, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 13, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 13, 2021ORDER - LEAVE
Date: July 07, 2021ORDER - MEDIATION
Date: May 18, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 10, 2021BRIEF FILED
Date: August 09, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: July 15, 2021WITNESS LIST
Date: August 10, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2023Motion - Partial Summary Judgment
Date: July 15, 2021WITNESS LIST
Date: August 09, 2021OBJECTION
Date: May 24, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: July 14, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 02, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: February 24, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 13, 2021RESPONSE
Date: July 08, 2021BRIEF FILED
Date: March 27, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: July 13, 2021RESPONSE
Date: March 27, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 13, 2023RETURNED MAIL
Date: March 14, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: August 22, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 24, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: October 03, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: July 07, 2021RESPONSE
Date: July 08, 2021ORDER - COMPEL
Date: December 28, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: June 23, 2022ORDER - COMPEL
Date: October 13, 2022MOTION - COMPEL
Date: June 21, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 10, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 03, 2022ORDER - DENY
Date: August 15, 2021MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: June 28, 2022BRIEF FILED
Date: August 11, 20215TH COA ORDER
Date: April 25, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 02, 2021RESPONSE
Date: July 14, 2021ORDER - LIMINE
Date: August 15, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 04, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 09, 2021RESPONSE
Date: August 12, 2021MOTION - QUASH
Date: August 09, 2021BRIEF FILED
Date: August 10, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 10, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 12, 2021EXHIBIT LIST
Date: August 09, 2021MOTION - PROTECT
Date: August 13, 2021ORDER - DENY
Date: August 13, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 06, 2021RESPONSE
Date: July 14, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 15, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 14, 2021MOTION - PROTECT
Date: August 13, 2021RESPONSE
Date: July 13, 2021MOTION - EMERGENCY
Date: May 12, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 11, 2021RESPONSE
Date: May 11, 2020ORDER - DENY
Date: August 15, 2021MOTION - LEAVE
Date: July 02, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: June 25, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 11, 2021ORDER - ABATE
Date: April 29, 2022ORDER - MISC.
Date: August 15, 2021ORDER - LIMINE
Date: August 15, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: December 28, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: June 16, 2020ORDER - MISC.
Date: May 26, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: October 25, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: June 01, 2022CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: July 16, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 16, 2021MOTION - QUASH
Date: March 24, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: May 26, 2023RESPONSE
Date: June 06, 2023DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 27, 2023COA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER
Date: February 16, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 29, 20215TH COA ORDER
Date: April 27, 2022MOTION - RETAIN
Date: May 16, 2023OPINION
Date: April 27, 2022OBJECTION
Date: March 16, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 13, 2021OBJECTION
Date: February 03, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 29, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 06, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 09, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 10, 2022MOTION - STAY
Date: August 13, 2021MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: August 09, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: May 17, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: January 26, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: June 01, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 10, 2021RULE 11
Date: October 17, 2022RESPONSE
Date: March 23, 2020RESPONSE
Date: March 23, 2020RESPONSE
Date: March 25, 2020RESPONSE
Date: March 25, 2020Motion - Partial Summary Judgment
Date: July 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2060 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
May 02, 2060 | Docket Event | NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT | |
May 02, 2060 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT | |
August 24, 2030 | Docket Event |
GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' EMERGENCY MOTION TO COMFIRM SERVICE OF TRIAL SUBPOENAS NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR THIS CASE IS STAYED |
|
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Hearing | |
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS MAILED ORDER AGREED TO DISMISS |
|
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | REACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED AGREED ORDER TO DISMISS NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
AGREED MOTION TO DISMISS MOTION - DISMISS AGREED |
|
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.