Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Irwin, Robert J., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Maxwell, Stephen C, Sullivan, Daniel P, against Microwave Transmission Systems Inc, Richard, Mark Anthony, represented by Balido, Carlos A, Booker, Amber W, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 162nd District Court with MOORE, MARICELA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2017 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House162nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
MOTION - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: August 23, 2017DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: April 25, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 20, 2018ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: January 15, 2019MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: January 11, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 23, 2017ORDER - QUASH
Date: August 27, 2018DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: September 04, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 14, 2019SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: July 19, 2018RESPONSE
Date: February 22, 2019MOTION - COMPEL
Date: August 15, 2017DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: September 04, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: April 27, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 04, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 21, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 24, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 01, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 18, 2018DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: July 24, 2017RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: November 18, 2019ORDER - DENY
Date: February 25, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 16, 2017MOTION - LEAVE
Date: June 03, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 28, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 12, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 28, 2017ORDER - LEAVE
Date: June 05, 2019MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: January 04, 2019MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: April 04, 2019ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: March 08, 2017NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 17, 2019AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: October 11, 2018MOTION - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: March 07, 2017NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 28, 2017ORDER - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: August 25, 2017NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 18, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 12, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 20, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 24, 2018AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: October 11, 2018SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: July 19, 2018ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: February 14, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 01, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: April 27, 2018ORDER - QUASH
Date: August 27, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 29, 2018MOTION - COMPEL
Date: August 15, 2017MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: January 11, 2019DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: June 28, 2017MOTION - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: August 23, 2017ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: March 08, 2017MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: January 04, 2019RESPONSE
Date: February 22, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 14, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 07, 2017DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: July 24, 2017ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: January 11, 2017NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 16, 2017MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: April 04, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 04, 2019ORDER - LEAVE
Date: March 04, 2019ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: January 15, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: February 28, 2019MOTION - LEAVE
Date: June 03, 2019SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: March 15, 2017NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 03, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 19, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 25, 2019ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: November 05, 2018RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: November 18, 2019ORDER - LEAVE
Date: June 05, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: November 14, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 21, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 17, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 28, 2019ORDER - DENY
Date: February 25, 2019ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: October 22, 2020DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: September 04, 2018DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: April 25, 2018DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: September 04, 2018MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: April 19, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 11, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: January 28, 2019DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 16, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 14, 2019DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 12, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 17, 2019DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 13, 2019Motion - Leave
Date: February 25, 2019STRIKE SHEET
Date: August 20, 2019STRIKE SHEET
Date: August 20, 2019EXHIBIT LIST
Date: September 27, 2019MOTION - LEAVE
Date: December 12, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: March 18, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: January 23, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 06, 2019EXHIBIT LIST
Date: June 20, 2019MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: June 17, 2019DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 15, 2019EXHIBIT LIST
Date: June 19, 2019WITNESS LIST
Date: June 19, 2019MOTION - QUASH
Date: June 03, 2019DISCOVERY
Date: May 29, 2019MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: October 19, 2020CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE
Date: January 24, 2019DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 20, 2021DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 16, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 01, 2019WITNESS LIST
Date: September 30, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: April 30, 2020DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 14, 2020DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 20, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 19, 2020MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: October 29, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 29, 2021RULE 166
Date: March 16, 2022PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: May 31, 2022ORDER - MEDIATION
Date: March 22, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 21, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: October 03, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 07, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 10, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: June 07, 2022EXHIBIT LIST
Date: November 01, 2021PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: November 01, 2021WITNESS LIST
Date: November 01, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 10, 2022NOTE - CLERKS
Date: August 17, 2022RULE 166
Date: November 02, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: February 16, 2022MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: March 08, 2022PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: March 08, 2022ORDER - MISC.
Date: March 09, 2022MOTION HEARING
Date: March 09, 2022Final Disposition Hearing
Date: September 09, 2022ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: November 05, 2018ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: February 14, 2018RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: November 14, 2019ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: January 11, 2017NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 25, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: February 28, 2019MOTION - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: March 07, 2017ORDER - LEAVE
Date: March 04, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 07, 2017DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: June 28, 2017NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 29, 2018NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 03, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 19, 2019MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: April 19, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 23, 2017CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 11, 2017DISCOVERY
Date: October 27, 2017CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 11, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 28, 2017CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 11, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 11, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 11, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 11, 2018ISSUE CITATION
Date: January 11, 2017CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 25, 2018RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: February 09, 2017CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 23, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 23, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 23, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 11, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 01, 2018MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: February 12, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 01, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: July 09, 2018MOTION - COMPEL
Date: February 22, 2019MOTION - QUASH
Date: July 06, 2018RESPONSE
Date: August 20, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 11, 2018MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: November 01, 2018MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: October 29, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 12, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 05, 2018ORDER - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: March 07, 2017AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 12, 2017CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 14, 2018DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 04, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 31, 2018EXHIBIT LIST
Date: January 04, 2019PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: January 04, 2019WITNESS LIST
Date: January 04, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 11, 2018WITNESS LIST
Date: April 04, 2019PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: April 04, 2019EXHIBIT LIST
Date: April 04, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 11, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 27, 2017CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 11, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 11, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
162nd Notice of Intent to Dismiss Final Disposition Hearing SETTLED |
|
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Cover Sheet (General) NOTE - CLERKS COPY ALL |
|
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR O/DISMISS TO JUDGE'S QUEUE |
|
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
COVER LETTER RE: ORDER AGREED DSIMISSAL CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE COVER LETTER RE: ORDER AGREED DISMISSAL |
|
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER AGREED DISMISSAL NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
162nd Jury Trial Reset Letter Jury Trial - Civil 3 - 4 DAYS |
|
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED JURY CHARGE/3RD AMENDED-PLAINTIFF PROPOSED JURY CHARGE 3RD AMENDED-PLAINTIFF |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER - MEDIATION | |
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF REFFERAL TO MEDIATION NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
1ST AMENDED RULE 166 RULE 166 1ST AMENDED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.