Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Crescent Electric Supply Co, filed a(n) Other (Civil) case represented by Duponte, Jennette E, against Elliot Electric Supply Inc, Sambitan, Andy, represented by Dewees, Jaime M., Rickman, Robert L, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 116th District Court with PARKER, TONYA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePARKER, TONYA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2016 |
CategoryOther (Civil) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House116th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
RESPONSE
Date: February 20, 2017NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 10, 2017CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: May 25, 2017COUNTER CLAIM
Date: October 18, 2016ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: October 18, 2016NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 20, 2016NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 20, 2016MOTION - COMPEL
Date: October 20, 2016NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: October 31, 2016MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: October 18, 2016NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 19, 2016MOTION - STRIKE
Date: October 19, 2016MOTION - QUASH
Date: October 18, 2016NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: December 15, 2016RESPONSE
Date: December 02, 2016RESPONSE
Date: November 04, 2016NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: November 01, 2016MOTION - SUBSTITUTE MEDIATOR
Date: October 12, 2016ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: August 24, 2016MOTION - EXTEND
Date: September 08, 2016BRIEF FILED
Date: September 23, 2016NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 06, 2016NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 08, 2016NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 22, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial - Civil Initial Trial Setting (Level 3) |
|
July 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Hearing | |
July 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
NONSIGNED ORDER DISMISS NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT Agreed Order to Dismiss - Sambitan |
|
July 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
MOTION - DISMISS Agreed Motion To Dismiss - Sambitan |
|
May 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Letter to Court re Mediation CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE RE: LETTER TO JUDGE ON MEDIATION |
|
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR ORDER DENYING DEFT'S M/MODIFY INJUNCTION OR TRIAL SETTING SIGNED 2-23-2017. ORIG/CLERK |
|
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER - DENY MODIFY INJUNCTION OR TRIAL SETTING |
|
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
MOTION HEARING ' DEFT'S M/MODIFY INJ RELIEF OR M/MODIFY TRIAL SETTING" TERESA (214-777-4204) 15MIN & CC REQ **DEF M/MODIFY INJUNCTIVE RELIER & MODIFY TRIAL SETTING** |
|
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR ORDER DENYING M/MODIFY INJUNCTION SUBMITTED TO JUDGE |
|
February 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE To Motion to Modify Injunction or Trial Setting - Pltf |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.