Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Young, Maria, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Ndukwe, Vincent, against Carefree Rv Resorts Inc, Nhc-Tx103 Llc, represented by Mayer, Mark, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 298th District Court with TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House298th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: October 19, 2015MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: November 09, 2015NO EVIDENCE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: September 21, 2015OBJECTION
Date: October 27, 2015AMENDED PETITION
Date: March 23, 2015ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: December 31, 2014OBJECTION
Date: October 30, 2015RESPONSE
Date: October 20, 2015NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 30, 2015RESPONSE
Date: October 22, 2015ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: May 04, 2015OBJECTION
Date: November 02, 2015NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 20, 2015Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: October 30, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Jury Trial - Civil |
|
March 22, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED | |
March 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS SUBMITTED 10/30/15 ORDER OF SUMMARY JUDGMT * ADMIN'S QUEUE |
|
November 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Young+Maria-motion for continuance MOTION - CONTINUANCE |
|
November 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Jury Trial - Civil |
|
November 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Young+Maria-Plaintiff's Objection to Defendant's Objection.p OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENCE IN RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR NO EVIDENCE SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS UNTIMELY |
|
October 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
151029 Objection to No Evidence MSJ OBJECTION Defendant's Objections to Plaintiff's Evidence in Response to Motion for No-Evidence Summary Judgment |
|
October 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
151029 ORDER ON No Evidence MSJ (2) NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT Proposed Order on Defendant's Motion for No-Evidence Summary Judgment |
|
October 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
151029 ORDER ON No Evidence MSJ (2) Motion - Summary Judgment DEF * 30 MIN * TRACIE 972 436 9300 |
|
October 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Young+Maria-Plaintiff's objection to Defendant's Motion for OBJECTION Plaintiff's Objection to Defendant's motion for summary judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.