Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Prosperity Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Milner, Harvey Clinton, against Bryan, Alan Brant, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 191st District Court with SLAUGHTER, GENA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House191st District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: December 31, 2014NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 05, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED | |
March 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
DC-14-15085.Prosperity.bryan.Judgment.Submission.ltr NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT Agreed Judgment |
|
March 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS O/JUDGMENT SUBMITTED |
|
February 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
1ST DUE DILIGENCE ATTEMPT - SHF UNEXECUTED / MVD PER RESIDENT, UNK FWD ADDRESS |
|
January 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
DC-14-15085.Prosperity.bryan.file.ltr.1.17.2015 RETURN OF SERVICE ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE AND WAIVER OF ISSUANCE AND SERVICE OF CITATION WITH ATTACHED LETTER |
|
January 02, 2015 | Docket Event | CITATION ISSUED | |
January 02, 2015 | Docket Event | CITATION | |
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
14.Prosperity.bryan.Original.Petition.fnl ORIGINAL PETITION |
|
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event | ISSUE CITATION | |
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event | NEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.