Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Broadway Village Homeowners Association, Inc., filed a(n) Other (Civil) case represented by Blend, Robert Michael, against Jacobs, Nedra S., Occupants, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 162nd District Court with BROWN, PHYLLIS LISTER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryOther (Civil) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House162nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 19, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
BROADWAY VLG - 413 Jacobs - Cert Knwn Addr -4-29-15 CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS |
|
April 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR O/FORECLOSURE TO JUDGE PURDY |
|
March 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
BROADWAY VLG - 413 Jacobs - Order for Foreclosure 3-19-15.pd NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT ORDER TO PROCEED WITH NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE AND FORECLOSURE SALE |
|
March 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
BROADWAY VLG - 413 Jacobs - Motion for Entry of Default Orde MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ORDER WITHOUT HEARING UNDER TRCP 736.7 |
|
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL NIEDRA S. JACOBS;CERTIFIED MAILER RETURNED BUT NOT REQUIRED PURSUANT TO TRCP 736.3(B)(2) |
|
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL OCCUPANTS; CERTIFIED MAILER RETURNED BUT NOT REQUIRED PURSUANT TO TRCP 736.3(B)(2) |
|
January 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
CITATION CERT/MAIL S.M. |
|
January 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
CITATION REG/MAIL S.M. |
|
January 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
BROADWAY - 413 Jacobs - Citation Clerk - 1-6-15 CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE REQUEST FOR CITATIONS |
|
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event | ISSUE CITATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.