Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
O Foreclosure, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Duong, Tiffany M, Hooper, Jennifer A, against Occupant, Patterson, Linda J, Patterson, Tamara M, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 14th District Court with MOYE', ERIC presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryForeclosure |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court House14th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: December 31, 2014NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: January 26, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Foreclosure | |
April 13, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED | |
March 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOH NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT ON FORECLOSURE |
|
March 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
DESIG OF ATTY DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL |
|
March 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL LINDA PATTERSON; CERTIFIED MAILER RETURNED BUT NOT REQUIRED PURSUANT TO TRCP 736.3 (B) (2) |
|
March 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Foreclosure | |
March 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL TAMARA PATTERSON; CERTIFIED MAILER RETURNED BUT NOT REQUIRED PURSUANT TO TRCP 736.3 (B) (2) |
|
March 06, 2015 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION | |
February 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOH 20130134000408 NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT FORECLOSURE |
|
February 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
201301340000408CLKA CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS Certificate of Last Known Mailing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.