Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
The Bank Of New York Mellon As Trustee For Nationstar Home Equity Loan Trust 200, filed a(n) Other (Civil) case represented by Taherzadeh, Selim, against Brown Iii, William, Occupant, Robinson, Lorretta, Robinson, Luella, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 134th District Court with TILLERY, DALE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2014 |
CategoryOther (Civil) |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House134th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: December 12, 2014CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: December 12, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED | |
February 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR DEFAULT ORDER ALLOWING FORECLOSURE - signed |
|
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION hold for default |
|
January 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Robinson MFD MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
December 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
CITATION REG/MAIL S.M. |
|
December 17, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION | |
December 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
CITATION CERT/MAIL S.M. |
|
December 12, 2014 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL PETITION | |
December 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Citation Requestx CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE CITATION REQUEST |
|
December 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
CIVIL CASE INFORMATION SHEET CASE FILING COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.