Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Thomas, Gary W., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Heald, Kristofor, against Ferguson, James, Ferguson, Martin, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 134th District Court with TILLERY, DALE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2014 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House134th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: February 23, 2015NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: December 18, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS NEW CAUSE NUMBER REC'D FROM TARRANT COUNTY 348 278612 15. SLA |
|
May 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS CASE TRANSFERED TO TARRANT COUNTY VIA CERT MAIL9214 8901 0661 5400 0058 6085 06 SLA |
|
May 14, 2015 | Docket Event | CC TRANSFER | |
March 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE BILLING LETTER EMAILDED TO ALL PARTIES LISTED. |
|
March 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS PUT IN TRSF QUEUE |
|
March 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR ESERVE: Order - Transfer (Env#: 4399109) |
|
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION hold for transfer order to Tarranty Cnty |
|
December 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Plts Amended OP [adding 47c language]-1632 AMENDED PETITION 1ST |
|
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION | |
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR E-FILE & E-SERVE: NDWOP (ENV: 3536009) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.