Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Car-Freshner Corporation, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Mccarthy, Ian A., against Friendly Automotive Supply, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 101st District Court with WILLIAMS, STACI presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2014 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House101st District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
AMENDED PETITION
Date: February 06, 2015ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: December 02, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION mailed 4.13.15 |
|
April 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT MAILED COPY ALL |
|
April 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Motion - Default Judgment | |
April 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
24429-Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT PLAINTIFFS |
|
April 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
24429-Default Judgment NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED ORDER DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
April 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Status Conference |
|
February 18, 2015 | Docket Event | CITATION SOS/COI/COH/HAG | |
February 16, 2015 | Docket Event | ISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
AMENDED PETITION 1ST |
|
December 05, 2014 | Docket Event | CITATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.